U.S. Bank National Association v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: |
U.S. Bank National Association |
Defendant: |
John Doe, Terance Edwards, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, LSI Title Company Of Oregon, LLC and West Coast Servicing, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv01307 |
Filed: |
June 27, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Oregon |
Office: |
Portland (3) Office |
Presiding Judge: |
John V. Acosta |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 12, 2022 |
Filing
128
AMENDED JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE: Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Associations Motion for Judgment of Foreclosure 125 is GRANTED. Signed on 4/12/2022 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/12/2022.) (kms)
|
May 31, 2019 |
Filing
120
OPINION and ORDER - Upon review, I agree with Judge Acosta's recommendation and I ADOPT Findings and Recommendation 117 , except as noted. I GRANT in part and DENY in part Plaintiffs Motion for Attorney Fees 101 and Bill of Costs 103 . Plaintiff is awarded $27,150.20 in attorney fees and $1,367.00 in costs.IT IS SO ORDERED.DATED this 31st day of May, 2019, by Chief United States District Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 5/31/19.) (peg)
|
September 26, 2018 |
Filing
96
OPINION AND ORDER: Upon review, I agree with Judge Acostas recommendation and I ADOPT the F&R 74 in full. I GRANT in part and DENY in part Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 56 . Signed on 9/26/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
|
June 18, 2018 |
Filing
66
Opinion and Order re Findings & Recommendation: Motion for Entry of Default 50 should be denied 63 . Upon review, I agree with Judge Acosta's recommendation and I ADOPT the F&R 63 as my own opinion. The Motion 50 is DENIED. Signed on 6/18/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss)
|
August 3, 2017 |
Filing
30
OPINION and ORDER - Upon review, I agree with Judge Acostas recommendations and ADOPT the F&R 27 as my own opinion. Accordingly, I GRANT in part and DENY in part U.S. Banks Motion to Dismiss 4 , and GRANT Attorney Defendants Motion to Dismiss 9 . However, I also give Mr. Edwards leave to amend his first counterclaim to assert additional facts supporting his securitization theory. Mr. Edwardss second counterclaim is DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED.DATED this 3rd day of August, 2017, by Chief United States District Judge Michael W. Mosman. (copy mailed to defendant Edwards) (peg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?