Harney v. Associated Materials, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Harney, Christine Wayenberg, Michael Harney and Ozzie Gilbert
Defendant: Associated Materials, LLC, Associated Materials, LLC., Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC. a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Alside Building Products, Inc and Associated Materials Incorporated a Delaware corporation doing business as Gentek Building Products, Inc. doing business as Alside Building Products, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01587
Filed: August 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Filed by Michael Harney. (Wilkinson, Robert)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Notice of Change of Address. , Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Blake, Anthony)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER - The parties' joint motion to amend case management order (ECF #73 ) is GRANTED as follows: (1) the close of discovery for issues related to the motion to certify class is 4/1/2019; (2) Plaintiffs' motion to certify is due by 5/8/2019; (3) the deadline to add additional parties or amend the complaint is 5/8/2019; (4) Defendants to depose any expert witness used to support Plaintiffs' motion for class certification by 6/8/2019; (5) Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' motion for class certification 7/9/2019; (6) Plaintiffs to depose any witness used to oppose Plaintiffs' motion for class certification by 8/9/2019; and (7) Plaintiffs' reply in support of motion for class certification is due by 9/10/2019. Any expert witness used in support or opposition to the motion for class certification should be disclosed contemporaneously with the motion and any opposition to motion. The Court will set a hearing on the motion at a later date. Any remaining case deadlines will be set 30 days following the Court's ruling on class certification. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Motion to Amend/Correct (Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Order) Order on motion for extension of discovery & PTO deadlines,,, 71 . Filed by Michael Harney. (Wilkinson, Robert) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct event type (mja).
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Answer to #52 Amended Complaint . Filed by Associated Materials, LLC., Associated Materials Incorporated. (Sands, Darin)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER - The parties' joint motion for extension of discovery & PTO deadlines (ECF #70 ) is GRANTED as follows: (1) the discovery deadline for issues related to the motion to certify class is 12/3/2018; (2) Plaintiffs' motion to certify is due by 1/8/2019; (3) the deadline to add additional parties and/or amend complaint is 1/8/2019; (4) Defendants to depose any expert witness used to support Plaintiffs' motion for class certification by 2/8/2019; (5) Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' motion for class certification 3/11/2019; (6) Plaintiffs to depose any witness used to oppose Plaintiffs' motion for class certification by 4/11/2019; and (7) Plaintiffs' reply in support of motion for class certification is due by 5/13/2019. Any expert witness used in support or opposition to the motion for class certification should be disclosed contemporaneously with the filing of the motion or response thereto. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order regarding Joint Motion to Reset Case Schedule, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Case Management Order) (Nelson, Alex)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Opinion and Order - Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim (ECF #57 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendants' motion is granted as to Plaintiff Gilbert's implied warranty claim, and both Plaintiffs' unjust enrichment claims, which are dismissed with prejudice. Defendants' motion is also granted as to Plaintiffs' unlawful trade practices claims based on affirmative misrepresentation, which are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants' motion is denied as to all other claims, including Plaintiffs' unlawful trade practices claims based on Defendants' failure to disclose. Plaintiffs may file an amended pleading within two weeks from the date of this Opinion and Order if Plaintiffs believe that additional allegations will cure the identified deficiencies. Signed on 1/18/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Minutes of Oral Argument Hearing: Order - Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (ECF #57 ) is taken under advisement as of 12/5/2017. Anthony T. Blake, Michael J. Lowder, and Robert W. Wilkinson present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Michael K. Farrell and Darin M. Sands present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Notice of Appearance of Anthony T. Blake appearing on behalf of Ozzie Gilbert, Michael Harney Filed by on behalf of Ozzie Gilbert, Michael Harney. (Blake, Anthony)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #57 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC.. (Sands, Darin)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Justin D. Monahan Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wilkinson, Robert)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Declaration of Robert W. Wilkinson ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Ozzie Gilbert, Michael Harney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (Wilkinson, Robert)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #57 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Ozzie Gilbert, Michael Harney. (Wilkinson, Robert)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTES of Telephone Rule 16 Conference: Order - The case deadlines are extended as set out in the Case Management Order, ECF #61 . Oral argument on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF #57 ) is set for December 5, 2017 at 1:00PM in Portland, Courtroom 15B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Michael J. Lowder, Anthony Blake, Jr., and Justin Monahan present as counsel for Plaintiff. Michael K. Farrell, Daniel M. Kavouras and Darin Sands present as counsel for Defendants.(Court Reporter Dennis Apodaca.)Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Case Management Order. Signed on 9/26/2017 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Date to Respond to Third Motion to Dismiss (ECF #59 ) is GRANTED. Response is due by 10/5/2017. Reply is due by 10/19/2017. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #57 . Filed by Ozzie Gilbert, Michael Harney. (Monahan, Justin)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Exhibits A re Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #57 . Filed by Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC.. (Sands, Darin)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Associated Materials, LLC., Associated Materials Incorporated. (Sands, Darin)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - At the parties' request, the Court is setting a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for 9/26/2017 at 10:00AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER - Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (ECF #54 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 9/7/2017. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Second Ameded Complaint. Filed by Associated Materials, LLC., Associated Materials Incorporated. (Sands, Darin)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - At the parties' request, the Court is striking the Oral Argument Hearing set for 8/7/2017. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF #39 ) is DENIED with leave to renew. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Second Amended Complaint . Filed by Michael Harney, Ozzie Gilbert against Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC.. (Wilkinson, Robert)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of Claims Asserted by Christine Wayenberg With Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(A)(1)(A)(II) by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Monahan, Justin)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order - Setting Oral Argument on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF #39 for 8/7/2017 at 10:00AM in Portland, Courtroom 13B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #39 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC.. (Sands, Darin)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order Under Federal Rules of Evidence 502(D) and (E). Signed on 5/1/2017 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed on 5/1/2017 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER - The Parties' Joint Motion to Vacate Schedule (ECF #43 ) is GRANTED. The Court will set a scheduling conference once it has ruled on the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF #39 . Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Proposed Form of Order Submitted (filed as Stipulated Request for an Order Under Federal Rules of Evidence 502(D) and (E) and Proposed Order. Filed by All Defendants. (Sands, Darin)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Proposed Form of Order Submitted filed as Stipulated Protective Order. Filed by All Defendants. (Sands, Darin)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Joint Motion to Vacate Schedule and for Post-Rule 12 Scheduling Conference. Filed by All Defendants. (Sands, Darin)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Response Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #39 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F - G, #5 Exhibit H - I) (Monahan, Justin)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Date to Respond to Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss (ECF #40 ) is GRANTED. Response is due by 4/18/2017. Reply is due by 5/2/2017. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Monahan, Justin)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Associated Materials, LLC., Associated Materials Incorporated. (Sands, Darin)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint #37 is GRANTED. Response due by 3/21/2017. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Filed by Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC.. (Sands, Darin)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Amended Complaint Amended Class Action Allegation Complaint. Filed by Michael Harney, Ozzie Gilbert, Christine Wayenberg against All Defendants. (Monahan, Justin)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order - The Court strikes the oral argument hearing set for 3/6/2017. See Order #34 . Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - The Court interprets Plaintiff's response as requesting leave to file an amended complaint. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to amend his complaint, DENIES Defendants' pending Motion to Dismiss (ECF #27 ) as moot, and will evaluate the merits of any subsequent motion to dismiss by Defendants after Plaintiff files his First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff has until February 20, 2017, to file his First Amended Complaint. Signed on 2/6/2017 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order - Setting oral argument on Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF #27 ) for 3/6/2017 at 10:00AM in Portland, Courtroom 13B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Reply to Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #27 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC.. (Sands, Darin)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Joint Report Of Rule 26(f) Conference and Discovery Plan. Filed by Michael Harney. (Wilkinson, Robert)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #27 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration In Support w/Exhibits) (Wilkinson, Robert)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Date to Respond to Motion to Dismiss (ECF #27 ) is GRANTED. Response is due by 12/30/2016. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #27 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Monahan, Justin)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Sands, Darin)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Return of Service Executed as to Associated Materials, LLC. served on 10/17/2016, answer due on 11/7/2016 (Monahan, Justin) Modified on 12/5/2016 to reflect service date and answer due date (jtj).
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Return of Service Executed as to Associated Materials Incorporated served on 11/1/2016, answer due on 11/22/2016. (Monahan, Justin)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Daniel M. Kavouras (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: dmkavouras. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel M. Kavouras for Associated Materials Incorporated and Associated Materials, LLC.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4807082 issued. Signed on 11/7/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Michael K. Farrell (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: mkfarrell. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael K. Farrell for Associated Materials Incorporated and Associated Materials, LLC.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4807079 issued. Signed on 11/7/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Sam A. Camardo (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: sacamardo. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sam A. Camardo for Associated Materials Incorporated and Associated Materials, LLC.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4807070 issued. Signed on 11/7/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #13 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 12/5/2016. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel M. Kavouras . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4807082. Filed by All Defendants. (Sands, Darin)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael F. Farrell . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4807079. Filed by All Defendants. (Sands, Darin)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sam A. Camardo . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4807070. Filed by All Defendants. (Sands, Darin)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Sands, Darin)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by All Defendants. (Sands, Darin)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines (ECF #11 ) is GRANTED. The service of the summons and complaint is extended to 12/2/2016. Discovery is to be completed by 4/3/2017. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/3/2017. Pretrial Order is due by 5/3/2017. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines and Service on Defendant. Filed by Michael Harney. (Monahan, Justin)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Michael J. Lowder (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: mjlowder. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Lowder for Michael Harney. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4723140 issued. Signed on 8/22/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Alex M. Nelson (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: amnelson. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alex M. Nelson for Michael Harney. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-472311 issued. Signed on 8/22/2016 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alex M. Nelson. The PDF attached to this entry at filing was incorrect. The document was missing the signature of local counsel. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (eo)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Lowder . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4723140. Filed by Michael Harney. (Monahan, Justin)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alex M. Nelson . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4723112. Filed by Michael Harney. (Monahan, Justin) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/19/2016) (eo).
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Associated Materials Incorporated, Associated Materials, LLC.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/2/2016. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/3/2017. Pretrial Order is due by 1/3/2017. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. Class Action Allegation Complaint Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4707334 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Michael Harney against Associated Materials Incorporated, dba Alside, Associated Materials, LLC, dba Alside (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons). (Wilkinson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harney v. Associated Materials, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Wayenberg
Represented By: Justin Monahan
Represented By: Robert W. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Harney
Represented By: Michael J. Lowder
Represented By: Alex M. Nelson
Represented By: Anthony T. Blake
Represented By: Justin Monahan
Represented By: Robert W. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozzie Gilbert
Represented By: Alex M. Nelson
Represented By: Anthony T. Blake
Represented By: Justin Monahan
Represented By: Robert W. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Materials, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Materials, LLC.
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Sam A. Camardo
Represented By: Darin M. Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Materials Incorporated
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Sam A. Camardo
Represented By: Darin M. Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Materials, LLC. a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Alside Building Products, Inc
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Sam A. Camardo
Represented By: Darin M. Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Materials Incorporated a Delaware corporation doing business as Gentek Building Products, Inc. doing business as Alside Building Products, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Kavouras
Represented By: Michael K. Farrell
Represented By: Sam A. Camardo
Represented By: Darin M. Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?