NECA-IBEW Pension Trust Fund et al v. Precision Castparts Corp., et al
Plaintiff: Angela Lohmann
Defendant: Mark Donegan, Don R. Graber, Lester L. Lyles, Daniel J. Murphy, Vernon E. Oechsle, Precision Castparts Corp., Ulrich Schmidt, Richard L. Wambold and Timothy A. Wicks
The Decatur Plan: NECA-IBEW Pension Trust Fund
Case Number: 3:2016cv01756
Filed: September 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 114 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Lydia Anderson-Dana is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Nadia H. Dahab Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE that currently there is partial consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in this case. If the non-consenting party would like to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, the consent form may be found on the court's website (https://www.ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/filing-and-forms/forms/civil-forms), and may be filed electronically under the Civil Event "Other Filings/Consents," or sent via mail or hand delivered to the Clerk's Office. For more information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction, see https://www.ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/court-info/judges/consenting-to-magistrate-jurisdiction. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #99 is Denied. Signed on 9/27/19 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (gm)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Scheduling Order: Unopposed Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Order #110 is GRANTED. Fact Discovery shall be completed by 10/31/2019. Motion for leave to amend pleadings is due by 11/15/2019. Response to motion for leave to amend pleadings is due by 12/16/2019. Parties shall a submit joint scheduling motion proposing deadlines for class certification, expert discovery, Joint ADR Report and dispositive motions ten business days after either denial of motion to amend or Defendants' answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 110 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Case Management Order on motion for extension of discovery & PTO deadlines,, 98 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
September 18, 2019 Filing 109 Notification of CM/ECF Account for David A. Markewitz (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: damarkewitz. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (jn)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Markewitz for Precision Castparts Corp. Signed on 9/18/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (jn)
September 17, 2019 Filing 107 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David A. Markewitz . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6003814. Filed by All Defendants. (Daniels, Brad)
September 4, 2019 Filing 106 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 9/4/2019 regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to compel #99 . The Court will issue a decision after in camera review of the documents, as discussed on the record. Esther Lee Bylsma, A. Rick Atwood, Nadia H. Dahab, Lawrence Deutsch, and Jennifer S. Wagner present as counsel for plaintiffs. Omid H. Nasab, Justin C. Clarke, and Brad S. Daniels present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Ryan White. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 105 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel Titled as "Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Proxy Documents" #99 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Mark Donegan, Don R. Graber, Lester L. Lyles, Daniel J. Murphy, Vernon E. Oechsle, Precision Castparts Corp., Ulrich Schmidt, Richard L. Wambold, Timothy A. Wicks. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin C. Clarke in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (Baron, Robert)
August 22, 2019 Filing 104 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Justin C. Clarke (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jcclarke. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (jn)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Justin C. Clarke for Precision Castparts Corp. Signed on 8/22/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (jn)
August 22, 2019 Filing 102 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin C. Clarke . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5973493. Filed by Precision Castparts Corp.. (Daniels, Brad)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Scheduling Order: SETTING a Telephonic Discovery Hearing for Wednesday, 9/4/2019 at 09:00AM (by telephone) regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #99 before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Defendants' response to the motion to compel is now due by 8/23/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 100 Declaration of Nadia H. Dahab in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Proxy Documents. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to compel, #99 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Dahab, Nadia)
August 14, 2019 Filing 99 Motion to Compel Titled as "Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Proxy Documents". (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER: Joint Unopposed Motion to Amend Case Management Order #97 is GRANTED. New case schedule is as follows: Close of Fact Discovery is Friday, 8/30/2019. Plaintiffs' Expert Reports are due Monday, 9/30/2019. Defendants' Expert Reports due Tuesday, 11/12/2019. Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Expert Reports due Wednesday, 12/11/2019. Expert Discovery to be completed by Tuesday, 2/18/2020. Joint Alternative Dispute Resolution Report due Tuesday, 2/18/2020. Dispositive Motions, if any, are due Wednesday, 4/8/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
May 28, 2019 Filing 97 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Case Management Order on motion for extension of discovery & PTO deadlines,, 90 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
April 12, 2019 Filing 96 Notice of Appearance of Jennifer S. Wagner appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Jennifer)
March 25, 2019 Filing 95 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 3/22/2019 before Judge Youlee Yim You, Court Reporter Ryan White, telephone number 503-326-8184 or ryan_white@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 4/1/2019. Redaction Request due 4/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2019. (White, Ryan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 94 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 3/22/2019 regarding Motion to Quash #91 and discovery dispute. For reasons stated on the record, plaintiffs' Motion to Quash #91 is denied and defendants' 3/11/2019 request that the court order unredacted copies of produced documents is also denied. Lawrence Deutsch, Nadie H. Dahab, and Rick Atwood present as counsel for plaintiffs. Omid H. Nasab present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Ryan White. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Scheduling Order: SETTING a Telephonic Discovery Hearing for Friday, 3/22/2019 at 09:00AM (by telephone) before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
March 6, 2019 Filing 92 Response in Opposition to Motion to Quash And/Or For Motion for Protective Order #91 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Daniels, Brad)
February 28, 2019 Filing 91 Motion to Quash And/Or For, Motion for Protective Order . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Dahab, Nadia)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER: Unopposed Joint Motion to Amend Case Management Order #89 is GRANTED. New case schedule is as follows: Deadline to join other parties and amend pleadings is 2/28/2019. Close of Fact Discovery is 5/31/2019. Plaintiffs' Expert Reports due 6/21/2019. Defendants' Expert Reports due 8/2/2019. Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Expert Reports due 8/30/2019. Expert Discovery to be completed by 10/4/2019. Joint Alternative Dispute Resolution Report due 10/4/2019. Dispositive Motions, if any, are due 11/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 14, 2019 Filing 89 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Case Management Order re Rule 16 Conference,,,,,, #82 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
August 23, 2018 Filing 88 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jacob M. Polakoff (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jmpolakoff. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jacob M. Polakoff for Angela Lohmann and NECA-IBEW Pension Trust Fund. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5526542 issued. Signed on 8/23/2018 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
August 22, 2018 Filing 86 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacob M. Polakoff . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5526542. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
August 20, 2018 Filing 85 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Robin Switzenbaum Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed on 8/17/2018 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
August 15, 2018 Filing 83 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
February 22, 2018 Filing 82 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 2/22/2018. Notice Regarding Civil Case Procedures attached. Initial Disclosures shall be exchanged by March 7, 2018. Deadline to join other parties and amend pleadings is December 28, 2018. Close of Fact Discovery is February 28, 2019. Plaintiffs' Expert Reports due March 29, 2019. Defendants' Expert Reports due May 31, 2019. Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Expert Reports due June 28, 2019. Expert Discovery to be completed by August 30, 2019. Joint Alternative Dispute Resolution Report due September 30, 2019. Dispositive Motions due October 31, 2019. The parties may file written consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge at any time, but the court recommends that consent forms be filed before a dispositive motion (i.e., motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment) is heard. The consent form may be found in the court's Civil Case Assignment Order (ECF #2 , p. 6). For more information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate jurisdiction, see https://www.ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/court-info/judges/consenting-to-magistrate-jurisdiction. Any discovery matters will be handled on an informal basis. Unless otherwise ordered, in the event a discovery motion is filed, no written response to the motion will be required. Rick Atwood, Robin Switzenbaum, Nadia H. Dahab, Lawrence Deutsch, and Eun Jin Lee present as counsel for plaintiffs. Robert H. Baron and Brad Daniels present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: None. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh) Modified on 2/22/2018 (pvh).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Amended Scheduling Order: RESETTING the 2/21/2018 Telephone Rule 16 Conference to Thursday, 2/22/2018 at 11:00AM (PST)(by telephone) before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 16, 2018 Filing 80 Fed R Civ P 26 Report . Filed by All Defendants. (Daniels, Brad) Modified on 3/1/2018 or correct title of document(cw).
February 7, 2018 Filing 79 Answer to #56 Amended Complaint . Filed by Daniel J. Murphy, Precision Castparts Corp., Don R. Graber, Vernon E. Oechsle, Timothy A. Wicks, Richard L. Wambold, Mark Donegan, Lester L. Lyles, Ulrich Schmidt. (Baron, Robert)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Scheduling Order: SETTING a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for Wednesday, 2/21/2018 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Unless otherwise ordered, any discovery disputes will be handled on an informal basis; in the event a discovery motion is filed, no written response to the motion will be required. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER. The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge You's Findings and Recommendation (#72 ) and, therefore, DENIES Defendants' Motion (#57 ) to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. The Court returns this matter to the Magistrate Judge for further handling. IT IS SO ORDERED #72 . Signed on 1/24/2018 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (pvh)
October 31, 2017 Filing 76 Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Related document(s): #75 Objection,. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
October 17, 2017 Filing 75 Objection(s) to #72 Findings & Recommendation,, ("Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge You's Findings and Recommendations"). Filed by Mark Donegan, Don R. Graber, Lester L. Lyles, Daniel J. Murphy, Vernon E. Oechsle, Precision Castparts Corp., Ulrich Schmidt, Richard L. Wambold, Timothy A. Wicks. (Baron, Robert)
October 17, 2017 Filing 74 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Precision Castparts Corp.. (Baron, Robert)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER referring Findings & Recommendation #72 and Motion to Dismiss #57 to Judge Anna J. Brown for her review and determination. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
October 3, 2017 Filing 72 Findings & Recommendation: Motion #57 should be denied in its entirety. These Findings and Recommendation will be referred to a district judge. Objections, if any, are due Tuesday, October 17, 2017. If no objections are filed, then the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement on that date. If objections are filed, then a response is due within 14 days after being served with a copy of the objections. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement. Signed on 10/3/2017 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
August 11, 2017 Filing 71 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Motion hearing held on July 26, 2017 before Judge Youlee Yim You, Court Reporter Nancy M. Walker, telephone number 503-326-8186 or e-mail nancy_walker@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained from the Court Reporter (503-326-8186) or through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 8/18/2017. Redaction Request due 9/1/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/11/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2017. (Walker, Nancy)
August 8, 2017 Filing 70 Response to Plaintiffs' Citations to New Authority. Filed by Mark Donegan, Don R. Graber, Lester L. Lyles, Daniel J. Murphy, Vernon E. Oechsle, Precision Castparts Corp., Ulrich Schmidt, Richard L. Wambold, Timothy A. Wicks. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #57 , Notice, #69 .) (Baron, Robert)
August 3, 2017 Filing 69 Notice re Response in Opposition to Motion, #59 titled as "Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint" Filed by All Plaintiffs (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #59 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Dahab, Nadia)
August 2, 2017 Filing 68 Notice Titled as "Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing of Demonstrative Exhibit Presented at Oral Argument" Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Dahab, Nadia)
August 2, 2017 Filing 67 Notice ("Defendants' Notice Of Filing Of Demonstrative Exhibit Used At Oral Argument") Filed by Mark Donegan, Don R. Graber, Lester L. Lyles, Daniel J. Murphy, Vernon E. Oechsle, Precision Castparts Corp., Ulrich Schmidt, Richard L. Wambold, Timothy A. Wicks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Baron, Robert)
July 27, 2017 Filing 65 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Daniel P. Margolskee (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: dpmargolskee. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel P. Margolskee for Mark Donegan,Don R. Graber,Lester L. Lyles, Daniel J. Murphy, Vernon E. Oechsle, Precision Castparts Corp.,Ulrich Schmidt,Richard L. Wambold,and Timothy A. Wicks. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5090548 issued. Signed on 7/27/2017 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
July 26, 2017 Filing 66 MINUTES of Proceedings: Oral Argument Hearing held on 7/26/2017 regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #57 . Motion is taken under advisement as of 7/26/2017. A. Rick Atwood, Robin Switzenbaum, Nadia H. Dahab, and Lawrence Deutsch present as counsel for plaintiffs. Robert H. Baron, Omid H. Nasab, Daniel P. Margoiskee present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Nancy Walker. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh)
July 25, 2017 Filing 63 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel P. Margolskee . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5090548. Filed by Mark Donegan, Don R. Graber, Lester L. Lyles, Daniel J. Murphy, Vernon E. Oechsle, Precision Castparts Corp., Ulrich Schmidt, Richard L. Wambold, Timothy A. Wicks. (Daniels, Brad)
June 5, 2017 Filing 62 Supplemental Declaration of Omid H. Nasab . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #57 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Daniels, Brad)
June 5, 2017 Filing 61 Reply in Support to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) #57 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Daniels, Brad)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Scheduling Order: SETTING Oral Argument for Wednesday, 7/26/2017 at 1:30PM in Courtroom 12B before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You regarding Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #57 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
May 5, 2017 Filing 59 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) #57 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Angela Lohmann, NECA-IBEW Pension Trust Fund. (Atwood, A.)
March 6, 2017 Filing 58 Declaration of Omid H. Nasab . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #57 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Daniels, Brad)
March 6, 2017 Filing 57 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6). Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Daniels, Brad)
January 5, 2017 Filing 56 Amended Complaint Amended Class Action Allegation Complaint. Filed by Angela Lohmann, NECA-IBEW Pension Trust Fund against All Defendants. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 20, 2016 Filing 55 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Robert H. Baron (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: rhbaron. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert H. Baron for Mark Donegan, Don R. Graber, Lester L. Lyles, Daniel J. Murphy, Vernon E. Oechsle,Precision Castparts Corp.,Ulrich Schmidt,Richard L. Wambold,and Timothy A. Wicks. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4842510 issued. Signed on 12/20/2016 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
December 19, 2016 Filing 53 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Brendan C. Benedict (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: bcbenedict. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brendan C. Benedict for Mark Donegan, Don R. Graber, Lester L. Lyles, Daniel J. Murphy, Vernon E. Oechsle, Precision Castparts Corp., Ulrich Schmidt, Richard L. Wambold,and Timothy A. Wicks. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4842542 issued. Signed on 12/19/2016 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
December 19, 2016 Filing 51 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Omid H. Nasab (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: ohnasab. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Omid H. Nasab for Mark Donegan, Don R. Graber, Lester L. Lyles,Daniel J. Murphy, Vernon E. Oechsle, Precision Castparts Corp., Ulrich Schmidt, Richard L. Wambold,and Timothy A. Wicks. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4842533 issued. Signed on 12/19/2016 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
December 16, 2016 Filing 49 Amended Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert H. Baron . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 0979-4842510. Filed by All Defendants. (Daniels, Brad)
December 15, 2016 Filing 48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brendan C. Benedict . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 0979-4842542. Filed by Mark Donegan, Don R. Graber, Lester L. Lyles, Daniel J. Murphy, Vernon E. Oechsle, Precision Castparts Corp., Ulrich Schmidt, Richard L. Wambold, Timothy A. Wicks. (Daniels, Brad)
December 15, 2016 Filing 47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Omid H. Nasab . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 0979-4842533. Filed by All Defendants. (Daniels, Brad)
December 15, 2016 Filing 46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert H. Baron . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 0979-4842510. Filed by All Defendants. (Daniels, Brad)
December 14, 2016 Filing 45 Notice of Appearance of Joel A. Mullin appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants (Mullin, Joel)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: APPROVING Stipulated Scheduling Order #39 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
December 14, 2016 Filing 43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brendan C. Benedict . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4842542. Filed by All Defendants. (Daniels, Brad)
December 14, 2016 Filing 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Omid H. Nasab . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4842533. Filed by All Defendants. (Daniels, Brad)
December 14, 2016 Filing 41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert H. Baron . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4842510. Filed by All Defendants. (Daniels, Brad)
December 14, 2016 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance of Brad S. Daniels appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants (Daniels, Brad)
December 13, 2016 Filing 39 Stipulated Motion for Order Titled as "Stipulated Scheduling Order". Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting the Trusts' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel Pursuant to the PSLRA. Signed on 11/21/2016 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
November 21, 2016 Filing 37 Notice re Motion to Appoint, #27 Titled as "Notice of Unopposed Motion" Filed by All Plaintiffs (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint, #27 .) (Dahab, Nadia)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding Order on Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice, #32 , Order on Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice, #33 . A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. The Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record: The original application docketed did not have the complete electronic signature of Judge You. The signed applications have been replaced with the complete signature and regenerated to all parties. (ecp)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Scheduling Order: Responses to the Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Titled as "The Trusts Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiffs Selection of Counsel Pursuant to the PSLRA; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof" #27 are due by 11/18/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (yy1)
November 3, 2016 Filing 34 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Danielle S. Myers (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: dsmyers. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Danielle S. Myers for Angela Lohmann and NECA-IBEW Pension Trust Fund. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4803688 issued. Signed on 11/3/2016 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp) (Main Document 33 replaced on 11/8/2016) (eo).
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence Deutsch for Angela Lohmann and NECA-IBEW Pension Trust Fund. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4803678 issued. Signed on 11/3/2016 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp) (Main Document 32 replaced on 11/8/2016) (eo).
November 2, 2016 Filing 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Danielle S. Myers . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4803688. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 2, 2016 Filing 30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lawrence Deutsch . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4803678. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
November 2, 2016 Filing 29 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #27 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. The PDFs attached to this entry at filing was incomplete. The entry was missing the proposed order. The proposed order has been uploaded as an attachment to the motion. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (eo)
November 1, 2016 Filing 28 Declaration of Gary M. Berne . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint, #27 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Berne, Gary)
November 1, 2016 Filing 27 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Titled as "The Trusts Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiffs Selection of Counsel Pursuant to the PSLRA; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof". Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2016: #1 Proposed Order) (eo).
October 28, 2016 Filing 26 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Timothy A. Wicks waiver sent on 10/24/2016. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
October 28, 2016 Filing 25 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Richard L. Wambold waiver sent on 10/24/2016. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
October 28, 2016 Filing 24 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Ulrich Schmidt waiver sent on 10/24/2016. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
October 28, 2016 Filing 23 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Vernon E. Oechsle waiver sent on 10/24/2016. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
October 28, 2016 Filing 22 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Daniel J. Murphy waiver sent on 10/24/2016. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
October 28, 2016 Filing 21 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Lester L. Lyles waiver sent on 10/24/2016. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
October 28, 2016 Filing 20 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Don R. Graber waiver sent on 10/24/2016. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
October 28, 2016 Filing 19 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Mark Donegan waiver sent on 10/24/2016. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
October 28, 2016 Filing 18 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Precision Castparts Corp. waiver sent on 10/24/2016. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
September 19, 2016 Filing 17 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Robin Switzenbaum (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: rswitzenbaum. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robin Switzenbaum for Angela Lohmann and NECA-IBEW Pension Trust Fund. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4753948 issued. Signed on 9/19/2016 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
September 19, 2016 Filing 15 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Patrick J. O'Hara (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: pjohara. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick J. O'Hara for Angela Lohmann and NECA-IBEW Pension Trust Fund. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4752602 issued. Signed on 9/19/2016 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
September 19, 2016 Filing 13 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Eun Jin Lee (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: eunjlee. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eun Jin Lee for Angela Lohmann and NECA-IBEW Pension Trust Fund. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4752596 issued. Signed on 9/19/2016 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
September 19, 2016 Filing 11 Notification of CM/ECF Account for A. Rick Atwood (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: arickatwood. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of A. Rick Atwood, Jr for Angela Lohmann and NECA-IBEW Pension Trust Fund. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4752590 issued. Signed on 9/19/2016 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Randall J. Baron for Angela Lohmann and NECA-IBEW Pension Trust Fund. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4752578 issued. Signed on 9/19/2016 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
September 16, 2016 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robin Switzenbaum . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4753948. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
September 15, 2016 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick J. O'Hara . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4752602. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
September 15, 2016 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eun Jin Lee . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4752596. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
September 15, 2016 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney A. Rick Atwood, Jr. . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4752590. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
September 15, 2016 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Randall J. Baron . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4752578. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
September 6, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mark Donegan, Don Graber, Lester L. Lyles, Daniel J. Murphy, Vernon E. Oechsle, Precision Castparts Corp., Ulrich Schmidt, Richard L. Wambold, Timothy A. Wicks. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (cib)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/3/2017. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/30/2017. Pretrial Order is due by 1/30/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (cib)
September 2, 2016 Filing 1 Complaint. Class Action Allegation Complaint Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4738880 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Angela Lohmann, NECA-IBEW Pension Trust Fund against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Named Plaintiff NECA_IBEW Trust Fund (The Decatur Plan), #2 Exhibit Certification of Named Plaintiff Angela Lohmann, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons). (Dahab, Nadia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NECA-IBEW Pension Trust Fund et al v. Precision Castparts Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Donegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don R. Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester L. Lyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon E. Oechsle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Castparts Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulrich Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Wambold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy A. Wicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Lohmann
Represented By: A. Rick Atwood, Jr.
Represented By: Randall J. Baron
Represented By: Gary M. Berne
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Eun Jin Lee
Represented By: Patrick J. O'Hara
Represented By: Robin Switzenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
The decatur plan: NECA-IBEW Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: A. Rick Atwood, Jr.
Represented By: Randall J. Baron
Represented By: Gary M. Berne
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Eun Jin Lee
Represented By: Patrick J. O'Hara
Represented By: Robin Switzenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?