Life Flight Network, LLC v. Metro Aviation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Life Flight Network, LLC
Defendant: Metro Aviation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00028
Filed: January 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: John V. Acosta
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OPINION and ORDER - Metro's Motion 47 to Strike is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 7th day of August, 2017, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Amended Order signed on 1/17/2017 by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to submit a bond of $4,000.00 to the Court no later than January 24, 2017. (rrr)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order signed on 1/13/2017 by Judge Anna J. Brown. The Court ORDERS Defendant to submit a bond of $4,000.00 to the Court no later than January 18, 2017. (rrr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Life Flight Network, LLC v. Metro Aviation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Life Flight Network, LLC
Represented By: Kaley L. Fendall
Represented By: Derek D. Green
Represented By: Robert D. Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Edward P. Fitch
Represented By: Sean M. Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?