Adidas America, Inc. et al v. Forever 21, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adidas AG, Adidas International Marketing B.V. and Adidas America, Inc.
Defendant: O & K Inc., Salt & Pepper Clothing, Inc., Famma Group, Inc., Forever 21, Inc., Legend Footwear Inc., Rainbow Stitches, Inc., A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC, EBK Collections, Inc., Prime Footwear Group, Inc., M Design & Manufacturing Inc., Le'baz, Inc., Urban Nation Apparel, Inc., Kei Yiu International and A&E Clothing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00377
Filed: March 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER: Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Amend Case Scheduled #222 is GRANTED. Dispositive Motions, if any, are due by 9/20/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct Case Schedule. Filed by A&E Clothing, Inc., EBK Collections, Inc., Forever 21, Inc., Kei Yiu International, O & K Inc.. (Snider, Timothy)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Joint ADR Report . Filed by All Plaintiffs.(Chollet, Nichole)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER. Signed on 6/11/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 6/7/2019. Nichole D. Chollet and Stephen M. Feldman present as counsel for plaintiffs. Jeffrey A. Wakolbinger and Julia L. Mazur present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Nancy Walker. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Scheduling Order: SETTING a Telephone Discovery Hearing for Friday, 6/7/2019 at 09:00AM (by telephone) before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Jennifer R. Findley Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Telephone Discovery Hearing held on 10/12/2018 before Judge Youlee Yim You, Court Reporter Bonita J. Shumway, telephone number 503-326-8188 or bonita_shumway@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 3/25/2019. Redaction Request due 4/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2019. (Shumway, Bonita)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER: Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines #214 is GRANTED. New case schedule is as follows: Expert Reports from party bearing burden of proof are due by 2/15/2019; Expert Reports from party not bearing burden of proof are due by 4/5/2019; Rebuttal Expert Reports on any new issues raised by party not bearing the burden are due by 5/10/2019. Expert Discovery to be completed by 6/28/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/26/2019. Dispositive Motions, if any, are due by 8/23/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines to Amend Case Schedule. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Akash R. Desai Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Scheduling Order: Joint Motion to Amend Case Schedule #210 is GRANTED. New case schedule is as follows: Expert Reports from party bearing burden of proof are due by 1/15/2019; Expert Reports from party not bearing burden of proof are due by 2/25/2019; Rebuttal Expert Reports on any new issues raised by party not bearing the burden are due by 4/1/2019. Expert Discovery to be completed by 5/14/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/12/2019. Dispositive Motions, if any, are due by 7/12/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held. The Court held a hearing on the parties' discovery disputes and issued a decision, as reflected on the record. Nicole Chollet, Stephen Feldman, and Akash Desai present as counsel for plaintiffs. Jeffrey A. Wakolbinger, Julia Mazur, and Nathan Brunette present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Case Schedule. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Scheduling Order: SETTING a Telephonic Discovery Hearing for Friday, 10/12/2018, at 2:30PM (by telephone) before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Crystal C. Genteman for Adidas AG, Adidas America, Inc. and Adidas International Marketing B.V.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5578278 issued. Signed on 10/2/2018 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Crystal C. Genteman . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5578278. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Scheduling Order: As agreed by the parties, new case schedule is as follows: Discovery is to be completed by October 12, 2018. Expert Reports from party bearing burden of proof are due November 9, 2018. Expert Reports from party not bearing burden of proof are due December 14, 2018. Rebuttal Expert Reports on any new issues raised by party not bearing the burden are due January 11, 2019. Close of Expert Discovery to be completed by February 8, 2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by February 8, 2019. Dispositive Motions, if any, are due by March 13, 2019. ORDER - In light of this new case schedule the telephone conference scheduled for Tuesday, 9/4/2018, at 2:00pm is STRICKEN. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jennifer R. Findley (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jrfindley. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer R. Findley for Adidas AG,Adidas America, Inc., and Adidas International Marketing B.V.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5533153 issued. Signed on 8/28/2018 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jennifer R. Findley . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5533153. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Scheduling Order: SETTING a Telephone Conference for Tuesday, 9/4/2018 at 2:00PM (PDT) before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 CORRECTED AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed on 4/27/2018 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Amended Motion for Protective Order / Corrected Amended Stipulated Protective Order. Filed by A&E Clothing, Inc., EBK Collections, Inc., Forever 21, Inc., Kei Yiu International, O & K Inc.. (Snider, Timothy)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Answer and Response Plaintiffs' Answer to Defendant Forever 21's First Amended Counterclaim. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim #192 .) (Feldman, Stephen) Modified on 4/24/2018 to clarify docket text (jtj).
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 OPINION AND ORDER: Upon review, I agree with Judge You's recommendation as to Forever 21's unclean hands affirmative defense, and I ADOPT that section of the F&R as my own opinion. However, the section of the F&R that addresses Forever 21's fourth counterclaim is now moot, since Forever 21 amended its counterclaim. I therefore decline to adopt that section of the F&R. Forthese reasons, I ADOPT IN PART the F&R. #181 . Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #58 is GRANTED as to Forever 21's fifth affirmative defense of unclean hands and DENIED AS MOOT as to Forever 21's fourth counterclaim for cancellation of a trademark registration. Signed on 4/10/18 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You: GRANTING the Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Case Schedule (#196 ). Discovery is to be completed by 9/13/2018. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/8/2019. Expert Discovery to be completed by 1/11/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/11/2019. Close of Fact Discovery is to be completed by September 13, 2018.Expert Reports from party bearing burden of proof are due October 11, 2018. Expert Reports from party not bearing burden of proof are due November 15, 2018. Rebuttal Expert Reports on any new issues raised by party not bearing the burden are due December 6, 2018. Close of Expert Discovery is January 11, 2019. Joint ADR Report is due January 11, 2019. Dispositive Motion Deadline is February 8, 2019. (eo)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Case Schedule. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT FAMMA GROUP, INC., ON CONSENT. Signed on 4/9/18 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Notice of Withdrawal of Objections to Findings and Recommendations #188 Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER: referring Motion for Permanent Injunction Assented to Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction on Consent Against Defendant Famma Group, Inc. #191 to Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman for his review and determination. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Amended Answer to #62 Amended Complaint,,, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim Against All Plaintiffs. Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Motion for Permanent Injunction Assented to Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction on Consent Against Defendant Famma Group, Inc.. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Feldman, Stephen)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER: Defendant Forever 21's Unopposed Motion to Amend its Fourth Counterclaim #189 is GRANTED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Fourth Counterclaim. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [proposed] First Amended Answer...and Counterclaim) (Snider, Timothy)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Objections to Findings & Recommendation, Applicable Party,,,, #181 . Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Julia L. Mazur (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jlmazur. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (jtj)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Julia L. Mazur for A&E Clothing, Inc., EBK Collections, Inc., Forever 21, Inc., Kei Yiu International, O & K Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5367452 issued. Signed on 4/4/2018 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (jtj)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Julia L. Mazur . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5367452. Filed by A&E Clothing, Inc., EBK Collections, Inc., Forever 21, Inc., Kei Yiu International, O & K Inc.. (Snider, Timothy)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Amended Stipulated Protective Order. Signed on 4/2/2018 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Amended Motion for Protective Order Amended Stipulated Protective Order. Filed by A&E Clothing, Inc., EBK Collections, Inc., Forever 21, Inc., Kei Yiu International, O & K Inc.. (Snider, Timothy)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER: referring Findings & Recommendation #181 and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #58 to Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman for his review and determination. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Findings & Recommendation (FILED UNDER SEAL): The Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #58 should be GRANTED. These Findings and Recommendations will be referred to a district judge. Objections, if any, are due Thursday, April 05, 2018. If no objections are filed, then the Findings and Recommendations will go under advisement on that date. If objections are filed, then a response is due within 14 days after being served with a copy of the objections. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendations will go under advisement. Signed on 3/22/2018 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT URBAN NATION APPAREL INC., ON CONSENT. Signed on 3/22/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (pvh)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER: referring Motion for Permanent Injunction Assented to Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction on Consent Against Defendant Urban Nation Apparel Inc. #178 to Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman for his review and determination. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Motion for Permanent Injunction Assented to Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction on Consent Against Defendant Urban Nation Apparel Inc.. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Feldman, Stephen)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER: Pursuant to Plaintiff's Stipulated Notice of Dismissal #174 dated 2/27/2018, Defendant A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC's Motion to Dismiss #125 is MOOT. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER: Granting Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #175 . Defendant Urban Nation Apparel's Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 3/14/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Third Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for Urban National Apparel to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal of Party A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT LEGEND FOOTWEAR INC., ON CONSENT. Signed on 2/26/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (pvh)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Permanent Injunction Against Defendant Le'Baz, Inc. on Consent. Signed on 2/16/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sss)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER: referring Motion for Permanent Injunction on Consent Against Defendant Legend Footwear Inc. #167 to Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman for his review and determination. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER: referring Motion for Permanent Injunction #166 to Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman for his review and determination. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER: Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC's Motion to Dismiss #125 . Response is due by 2/22/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #164 . Defendant Urban Nation Apparel's Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 2/28/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Motion for Permanent Injunction on Consent Against Defendant Legend Footwear Inc.. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Feldman, Stephen)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Motion for Permanent Injunction Assented to Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction on Consent Against Defendant Le' Baz, Inc.. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Feldman, Stephen)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Defendant A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC's to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #125 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for Defendant Urban Nation Apparel to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #161 .Defendant Urban Nation Apparel's Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 2/14/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT PRIME FOOTWEAR GROUP, INC., ON CONSENT. Signed on 2/2/2018 by Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman. (pvh)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for Defendant Urban Nation Apparel to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER: referring Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Assented to Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction on Consent Against Defendant Prime Footwear Group, Inc. #158 to Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman for his review and determination. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER: Granting Plaintiffs' (Second) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #125 . Response is due by 02/15/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Assented to Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction on Consent Against Defendant Prime Footwear Group, Inc., Motion for Permanent Injunction . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Feldman, Stephen)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #125 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Rainbow Stitches, Inc. with Prejudice #155 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss of Defendant Rainbow Stitches, Inc. with Prejudice. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Le'Baz, Inc. (related document: #151 Motion for default). (pvh)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT SALT & PEPPER CLOTHING, INC., ON CONSENT. Signed on 1/16/18 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls) Modified on 1/18/2018 to correct text bolding (jtj).
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Famma Group, Inc.. (Seror, Matthew)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendant Le' Baz Inc.. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Matthew L. Seror (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: mlseror. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew L. Seror for Famma Group, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5273789 issued. Signed on 1/11/2018 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Affidavit of Service upon Urban Nation Apparel, Inc. served on 1/9/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER: referring Plaintiffs' Motion for Permanent Injunction Assented to Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction on Consent Against Defendant Salt & Pepper Clothing, Inc. #143 to Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman for his review and determination. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER: Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC's Motion to Dismiss #125 . Response is due by 2/1/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Amended Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew L. Seror . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 0979-5273789. Filed by Famma Group, Inc.. (Aman, Kalley)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew L. Seror . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5273789. Filed by Famma Group, Inc.. (Aman, Kalley)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Motion for Permanent Injunction Assented to Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction on Consent Against Defendant Salt & Pepper Clothing, Inc.. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Feldman, Stephen)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #125 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: Granting Defendant Rainbow Stitches, Inc.'s Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #131 to Answer or otherwise Respond to Second Amended Complaint. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 1/22/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Answer to #62 Amended Complaint,,, with Jury Demand . Filed by Famma Group, Inc.. (Aman, Kalley)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Kei Yiu International. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Answer to #62 Amended Complaint,,, with Jury Demand . Filed by Kei Yiu International. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by EBK Collections, Inc.. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Answer to #62 Amended Complaint,,, with Jury Demand . Filed by EBK Collections, Inc.. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by A&E Clothing, Inc.. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Answer to #62 Amended Complaint,,, with Jury Demand . Filed by A&E Clothing, Inc.. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by O & K Inc.. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Answer to #62 Amended Complaint,,, with Jury Demand . Filed by O & K Inc.. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Filed by Rainbow Stitches, Inc.. (Van Loon, Erica)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Answer to Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim #123 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim #123 .) (Feldman, Stephen)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Legend Footwear Inc.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC. (Campbell, David)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 PERMANENT INJUNCTION against Defendant M Design & Manufacturing Inc. D/B/A Casting LA, on Consent. Signed on 12/29/2017 by Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman. (pvh)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Declaration of Deborah Evans Vincent in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Filed by A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #125 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Campbell, David)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Oral Argument requested. Filed by A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC. (Campbell, David)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #122 . Defendant Famma Group's Answer or other responsive pleading to adidas's Second Amended Complaint #62 is due by 1/8/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Amended Answer to #62 Amended Complaint,,, with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaim All Plaintiffs. Filed by Legend Footwear Inc.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER: Granting Defendant Legend Footwear, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion #119 for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #62 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER: referring Motion for Permanent Injunction Assented to Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction on Consent Against Defendant M Design & Manufacturing Inc. d/b/a Casting LA #100 to Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman for his review and determination. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims. Filed by Legend Footwear Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Document) (DuBoff, Leonard)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint #117 . Defendant Salt and Pepper Clothing, Inc.'s Answer or other responsive pleading is extended from 12/13/2017 to 1/8/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Urban Nation Apparel, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Answer to #62 Amended Complaint,,, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim All Plaintiffs. Filed by Legend Footwear Inc.. (DuBoff, Leonard)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Amended Proposed Summons to Urban Nation Apparel Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #96 upon Le'baz, Inc. served on 12/11/2017 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen) (Main Document 113 replaced on 12/19/2017) (eo).
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #96 upon Prime Footwear Group, Inc. served on 12/11/2017 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint #107 . Defendants' A&E Clothing, Kei Yiu International, EBK Collections, and O&K shall have until 1/8/2018 to Answer or otherwise respond to adidass Second Amended Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER: Granting A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Appear #103 . Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 12/29/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER: Granting Defendant Rainbow Stitches, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #98 . Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 1/8/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Scheduling Order: Granting Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Case Schedule #97 . New case schedule is as follows: Fact Discovery is to be completed by 6/15/2018; Expert Reports from party bearing burden of proof are due 7/13/2018; Expert Reports from party not bearing burden of proof are due 8/17/2018; Rebuttal Expert Reports on any new issues raised by party not bearing burden of proof are due 9/7/2018; Close of Expert Discovery shall be completed by 10/5/2018; Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/5/2018; Dispositive Motions are due by 11/2/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Certain Defendants to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Rainbow Stitches, Inc.. (Van Loon, Erica)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC. (Campbell, David)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Declaration of David C. Campbell . Filed by A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #103 .) (Campbell, David)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer /Appear. Filed by A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC. (Campbell, David)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Erica J. Van Loon (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: ejvanloon. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erica J. Van Loon for Rainbow Stitches, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5245029 issued. Signed on 12/11/2017 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp) Modified on 12/11/2017 to correct spelling (ecp).
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Motion for Permanent Injunction Assented to Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunction on Consent Against Defendant M Design & Manufacturing Inc. d/b/a Casting LA. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Feldman, Stephen)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erica J. Van Loon . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5245029. Filed by Rainbow Stitches, Inc.. (Lusk, Kelly)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint,,, #62 . Filed by Rainbow Stitches, Inc.. (Lusk, Kelly)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Case Schedule. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Summons Issued Electronically as to Le'baz, Inc., Prime Footwear Group, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Summons Prime Footwear Group) (jtj)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Amended Proposed Summons to Prime Footwear Group, Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Amended Proposed Summons to Le'baz, Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,, #76 upon Salt & Pepper Clothing, Inc. served on 11/22/2017 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,, #76 upon Rainbow Stitches, Inc. served on 11/22/2017 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,, #76 upon O & K Inc. served on 11/22/2017 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,, #76 upon M Design & Manufacturing Inc. served on 11/22/2017 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,, #76 upon Legend Footwear Inc. served on 11/24/2017 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,, #76 upon Kei Yiu International served on 11/22/2017 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,, #76 upon Famma Group, Inc. served on 11/27/2017 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,, #76 upon EBK Collections, Inc. served on 11/22/2017 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,, #76 upon A&E Clothing, Inc. served on 11/21/2017 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued,, #76 upon A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC served on 11/22/2017 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Answer to Answer #80 Answer to Forever 21's Amended Counterclaim. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Adidas America, Inc., Adidas AG, Adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Related document(s): Answer #80 .) (Feldman, Stephen)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Scheduling Order: SETTING Oral Argument for Thursday, 11/30/2017 at 10:00AM (PST) by telephone before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #58 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Answer to Amended Complaint,,, #62 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Related document(s): Amended Complaint,,, #62 .) (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Declaration of Stephen M. Feldman In Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #58 , Declaration, #78 , Reply to Motion #77 .) (Feldman, Stephen)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Supplemental Declaration of R. Charles Henn Jr. In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #58 , Reply to Motion #77 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Feldman, Stephen)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Reply In Support Of to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #58 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Summons Issued Electronically as to A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC, A&E Clothing, Inc., d/b/a Cozie USA EBK Collections, Inc., Famma Group, Inc., Kei Yiu International, Le'baz, Inc., Legend Footwear Inc., M Design & Manufacturing Inc., O & K Inc., Prime Footwear Group, Inc., Rainbow Stitches, Inc., Salt & Pepper Clothing, Inc., Urban National Apparel. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Proposed Summons to O&K, Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Proposed Summons to Prime Footwear Group Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Proposed Summons to Legend Footwear, Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Proposed Summons to A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Proposed Summons to M Design & Manufacturing, Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Proposed Summons to Le'baz, Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Proposed Summons to EBK Collections, Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Proposed Summons to Rainbow Stitches, Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Proposed Summons to Salt & Pepper Clothing, Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Proposed Summons to A&E Clothing Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Proposed Summons to Kei Yiu International, Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Proposed Summons to Urban Nation Apparel Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Second Amended Complaint (Counterfeiting, Trademark Infringement, Unfair Competition, Trademark Dilution, Deceptive Trade Practices, and Breach of Contract). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Adidas America, Inc.(an Oregon corporation), Adidas AG, Adidas International Marketing B.V.(a foreign entity) against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25). (Feldman, Stephen)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Notice of Filing Second Amended Complaint Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Response in Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #58 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Jeffrey A. Wakolbinger) (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Declaration of R. Charles Henn Jr. In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #58 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Feldman, Stephen)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Answer to Answer, #54 Plaintiffs' Answer to Defendant's Amended Counterclaim. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Answer, #54 .) (Feldman, Stephen)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: STRIKING case deadline set in Order 55 regarding motion for extension of time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #52 to Respond to Counterclaim and to Move to Strike Affirmative Defenses. Plaintiff shall have until 9/22/2017 to file their response to counterclaim and file amotion to strike. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Amended Answer to Amended Complaint,, #35 (Sealed, unredacted version). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Amended Complaint,, #35 .) (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Amended Answer to #35 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand [REDACTED], Amended Counterclaim against All Plaintiffs. Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaim and Move to Strike Affirmative Defenses. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Akash R. Desai (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: adesai. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Akash R. Desai for Adidas AG, Adidas America, Inc.,and Adidas International Marketing B.V.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5132674 issued. Signed on 8/31/2017 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nichole D. Chollet for Adidas AG, Adidas America, Inc., and Adidas International Marketing B.V.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5132665 issued. Signed on 8/31/2017 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion to Substitute a Party #47 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Motion to Substitute a Party and Change Case Caption. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Akash R. Desai . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5132674. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nichole D. Chollet . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5132665. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Answer to Amended Complaint,, #35 (Sealed, unredacted version). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Related document(s): Amended Complaint,, #35 .) (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Redacted Answer to #35 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against All Plaintiffs. Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Scheduling Order: Taking Motion for a More Definite Statement #28 under advisement as of 7/25/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Redacted Reply to Motion for a More Definite Statement #28 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Reply to Motion for a More Definite Statement #28 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference with attached Notice Regarding Civil Case Procedures. Open of Fact Discovery: August 14, 2017; Deadline to amend pleadings or add parties: October 13, 2017; Close of Fact Discovery: February 16, 2018; Expert Reports from party bearing burden of proof: March 2, 2018;Expert Reports from party not bearing burden of proof: April 6, 2018; Rebuttal Expert Reports on any new issues raised by party not bearing the burden: April 27, 2018; Close of Expert Discovery: June 1, 2018; Joint ADR Deadline: June 1, 2018; Dispositive Motion Deadline: June 29, 2018. Pursuant to correspondence received by the Court, the parties have agreed to forgo the initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1). If the parties have a discovery dispute, they shall submit a single, joint document that sets forth, issue by issue, each side's position on any discovery issue in dispute and, after full conference, the other side's response. There should be no need for a reply because each side must be fully informed of the other's position before the single, joint document may be filed. There will be no further filings allowed on the issues addressed in the joint filing. After receiving this document, the Court may rule in writing, convene a telephone conference, or direct the parties to appear in court in person. R. Charles Henn, Jr. and Stephen M. Feldman present as counsel for plaintiffs. Timothy W. Snider, Floyd A. Mandell, and Jeffrey A. Wakolbinger present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: None. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (nl)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for a More Definite Statement #28 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed on 7/12/2017 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Redacted Amended Complaint . Filed by Adidas America, Inc., Adidas AG, Adidas International Marketing B.V. against Forever 21, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25). (Feldman, Stephen)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Adidas AG, Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Feldman, Stephen)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Brunette, Nathan)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Second Amended Scheduling Order: RESETTING the 7/13/2017 Telephonic Rule 16 Conference from 9:30 AM to 08:30 AM (by telephone) before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Local Rules 16-2 and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. The parties may file written consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge at any time, but the court recommends that consent forms be filed before a dispositive motion (i.e., motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment) is heard. The consent form may be found in the court's Civil Case Assignment Order (ECF #4 , p. 6). For more information regarding the role of magistrates and consenting to magistrate jurisdiction, see https://www.ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/court-info/court-policies/role-of-magistrates. Unless otherwise ordered, any discovery disputes will be handled on an informal basis; in the event a discovery motion is filed, no written response to the motion will be required. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #30 to file a Response to Motion for a More Definite Statement #28 . Response deadline is extended from 7/5/2017 to 7/12/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion for a More Definite Statement #28 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Amended Scheduling Order: Resetting the 7/13/2017 Telephonic Rule 16 Conference from 10:00 AM to 9:30AM before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Local Rules 16-2 and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. The parties may file written consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge at any time, but the court recommends that consent forms be filed before a dispositive motion (i.e., motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment) is heard. The consent form may be found in the court's Civil Case Assignment Order (ECF #4 , p. 6). For more information regarding the role of magistrates and consenting to magistrate jurisdiction, see https://www.ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/court-info/court-policies/role-of-magistrates. Unless otherwise ordered, any discovery disputes will be handled on an informal basis; in the event a discovery motion is filed, no written response to the motion will be required. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Motion for a More Definite Statement . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (Wakolbinger, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Rule 16 Conference is set for 7/13/2017 at 10:00AM by telephone. Local Rules 16-2 and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. The parties may file written consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge at any time, but the court recommends that consent forms be filed before a dispositive motion (i.e., motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment) is heard. The consent form may be found in the court's Civil Case Assignment Order (ECF #4 , p. 6). For more information regarding the role of magistrates and consenting to magistrate jurisdiction, see https://www.ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/court-info/court-policies/role-of-magistrates. Unless otherwise ordered, any discovery disputes will be handled on an informal basis; in the event a discovery motion is filed, no written response to the motion will be required. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (nl)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave #24 to File First Amended Complaint Under Seal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Under Seal. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Joint Status Report . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Return of Service Executed as to Forever 21, Inc. served on 3/10/2017. (sss) Modified to correct text on 4/26/2017 (sss).
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of R. Charles Henn, Jr for Adidas AG, Adidas America, Inc.,and Adidas International Marketing B.V.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4982335 issued. Signed on 4/20/2017 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney R. Charles Henn, Jr. . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4982335. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Feldman, Stephen)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Case Deadlines #18 . ORDER - The parties are to file a Joint Status Report by 5/12/2017. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 6/9/2017. All other pending case deadlines are VACATED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Unopposed Motion to Extend Case Deadlines. Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (sss)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Clerk's Notice of Emailing to all counsel regarding Order on Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice, #13 Jeffrey A. Wakolbinger and Order on Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice Floyd A. Mandell, #15 . Pro Hac counsel received separate email with CM/ECF login information. (ecp)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Floyd A. Mandell (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: famandell. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Floyd A. Mandell for Forever 21, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 71786 issued. Signed on 3/20/2017 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jeffrey A. Wakolbinger (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jawakolbinger. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey A. Wakolbinger for Forever 21, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 71785 issued. Signed on 3/20/2017 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Floyd A. Mandell. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 71786. Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (ecp)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey A. Wakolbinger. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 71785. Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (ecp)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by Forever 21, Inc.. (sss)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Appearance of Timothy W. Snider, Nathan C. Brunette appearing on behalf of Forever 21, Inc.Filed by on behalf of Forever 21, Inc. (sss)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Listed Trademarks) (sss)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal. #2 . Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed and E-Mailed to attorney Stephen M. Feldman this date.) (sss)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of E-Mailing to attorney Stephen M. Feldman regarding Summons Issued #5 , and Discovery order, #4 . (sss)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Forever 21, Inc. (sss)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Clerk's Notice of Mailing to attorney Stephen M. Feldman regarding Summons Issued #5 , Discovery order,, #4 . (sss)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/5/2017. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/4/2017. Pretrial Order is due by 8/4/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Counsel for Plaintiff this date.) (sss)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (sss)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (sss)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Sealed Complaint for Trademark Infringement. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Receipt No. 71641. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Adidas America, Inc., Adidas AG, Adidas International Marketing B.V. against Forever 21, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Proposed Summons). (sss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adidas America, Inc. et al v. Forever 21, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adidas AG
Represented By: Crystal C. Genteman
Represented By: Jennifer R. Findley
Represented By: Stephen M. Feldman
Represented By: R. Charles Henn, Jr.
Represented By: Akash R. Desai
Represented By: Nichole D. Chollet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adidas International Marketing B.V.
Represented By: Crystal C. Genteman
Represented By: Jennifer R. Findley
Represented By: Stephen M. Feldman
Represented By: R. Charles Henn, Jr.
Represented By: Akash R. Desai
Represented By: Nichole D. Chollet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adidas America, Inc.
Represented By: Crystal C. Genteman
Represented By: Jennifer R. Findley
Represented By: Stephen M. Feldman
Represented By: R. Charles Henn, Jr.
Represented By: Akash R. Desai
Represented By: Nichole D. Chollet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O & K Inc.
Represented By: Floyd A. Mandell
Represented By: Julia L. Mazur
Represented By: Nathan C. Brunette
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Wakolbinger
Represented By: Timothy W. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt & Pepper Clothing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Famma Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kalley R. Aman
Represented By: Matthew L. Seror
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever 21, Inc.
Represented By: Floyd A. Mandell
Represented By: Nathan C. Brunette
Represented By: Julia L. Mazur
Represented By: Timothy W. Snider
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Wakolbinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legend Footwear Inc.
Represented By: Leonard D. DuBoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbow Stitches, Inc.
Represented By: Erica J. Van Loon
Represented By: Anne Devlan Foster
Represented By: Kelly R. Lusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&D Wholesale Vintage Clothing LLC
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Represented By: David C. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBK Collections, Inc.
Represented By: Floyd A. Mandell
Represented By: Julia L. Mazur
Represented By: Nathan C. Brunette
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Wakolbinger
Represented By: Timothy W. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Footwear Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Design & Manufacturing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Le'baz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Nation Apparel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kei Yiu International
Represented By: Floyd A. Mandell
Represented By: Julia L. Mazur
Represented By: Nathan C. Brunette
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Wakolbinger
Represented By: Timothy W. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&E Clothing, Inc.
Represented By: Floyd A. Mandell
Represented By: Julia L. Mazur
Represented By: Nathan C. Brunette
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Wakolbinger
Represented By: Timothy W. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?