Jarlstrom v. Aldridge et al

Plaintiff: Mats Jarlstrom
Defendant: Christopher D. Aldridge, William J. Boyd, Daren L. Cone, Shelly MC Duquette, Jason J. Kent, Logan T. Miles, Ron Singh, Sean W. St. Clair, Dave M. Van Dyke, Amin Wahab and Oscar J. Zuniga Jr.
Amicus: American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00652
Filed: April 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Stacie F. Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 OPINION AND ORDER. The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 72 ), and GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 79 ). Signed on 12/28/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (pvh)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons stated above, the Court DENIES Defendants' Motion for Entry of Judgment. (ECF No. 43 .) Signed on 12/14/2017 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AGREED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: Finding as Moot Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 25 . Signed on 5/30/2017 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (gw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarlstrom v. Aldridge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. Aldridge
Represented By: Christina L. Beatty-Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Boyd
Represented By: Christina L. Beatty-Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daren L. Cone
Represented By: Christina L. Beatty-Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly MC Duquette
Represented By: Christina L. Beatty-Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason J. Kent
Represented By: Christina L. Beatty-Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan T. Miles
Represented By: Christina L. Beatty-Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Singh
Represented By: Christina L. Beatty-Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean W. St. Clair
Represented By: Christina L. Beatty-Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave M. Van Dyke
Represented By: Christina L. Beatty-Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amin Wahab
Represented By: Christina L. Beatty-Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar J. Zuniga Jr.
Represented By: Christina L. Beatty-Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Civil Liberties Union of Oregon, Inc.
Represented By: Kristian S. Roggendorf
Represented By: Eugene Volokh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mats Jarlstrom
Represented By: Samuel B. Gedge
Represented By: Jill S. Gelineau
Represented By: Wesley Hottot
Represented By: William J. Ohle
Represented By: Kelly M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?