Moore v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Gregory H Moore
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2017cv01112
Filed: July 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael W. Mosman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of Commissioner's Final Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING AWARD OF EAJA FEES, EXPENSES COSTS: See order for full text. Signed on 8/29/18 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF REMAND AMENDING THIS COURT'S MAY 29,2018 OPINION AND ORDER. See attached order. Signed on 6/8/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record, this case is REMANDED to the ALJ for further proceedings. Signed on 5/29/18 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Janice E. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory H Moore
Represented By: Lisa R. J. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?