Harris v. UBH of Oregon, LLC
Plaintiff: David B. Harris
Defendant: UBH of Oregon, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv01296
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Ann L. Aiken
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER: UBH's Motion to Dismiss 19 is GRANTED and plaintiff's defamation claim is DISMISSED with prejudice. As it is the only remaining claim in this case, final judgment shall be entered. Signed on 1/28/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for appointment of pro bono counsel 16 is DENIED. Signed on 5/30/2018 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. A copy of this Opinion and Order was mailed to pro se plaintiff David B. Harris. (ck)
December 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's IIED and First Amendment claims are dismissed for failure to state a claim. However, plaintiff's Amended Complaint appears to state a claim under Oregon's common law of defamation. Plaintiff must follow the instructions for service to the defendant as set out in the Court's Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, issued September 21, 2017 7 . A copy of that order will be mailed to plaintiff with this opinion. Signed on 12/3/2017 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. A copy of this Opinion and Order and Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis was mailed to pro se plaintiff David B. Harris. (ck)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff is HEREBY ORDERED to file an amended complaint within thirty days from the date of this order. The amended complaint shall briefly and plainly state the facts supporting plaintiff's claims of intentional in fliction of emotional distress and defamation. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file an amended complaint as ordered will result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Amended complaint is due by 10/23/2017. Signed on 9/21/2017 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. A copy of this Opinion and Order was mailed to David B. Harris. (ck)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. UBH of Oregon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David B. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBH of Oregon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?