Goldingay v. Cheveron, U.S.A, etc
Plaintiff: |
Roger Goldingay |
Defendant: |
Chevron U.S.A. and Progressive Casualty Insurance Company |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv01491 |
Filed: |
September 22, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Oregon |
Office: |
Portland (3) Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael H. Simon |
Nature of Suit: |
Torts to Land |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 22, 2019 |
Filing
92
Opinion and Order on Attorney Fees - Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Reasonable Attorney Fees (ECF 73 ) is granted in part. After considering the written submissions of the parties and making the deductions detailed in this Opinion and Order, t he Court awards Plaintiffs collectively $78,609.77 in attorney fees against Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and awards Plaintiffs collectively $48,504.28 in attorney fees against Chevron U.S.A. Inc. This reflects a reduction of approximately 36 percent from the total amount requested by Plaintiffs. Signed on 2/22/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-01491-SI, 3:17-cv-01494-SI (mja)
|
August 3, 2018 |
Filing
66
Opinion and Order - Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (ECF 55 ), joined by Defendant Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (ECF 56 ), is GRANTED. Signed on 8/3/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-01491-SI, 3:17-cv-01494-SI (mja)
|
January 25, 2018 |
Filing
30
Opinion and Order - Progressive's Motion to Dismiss (ECF 15 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Chevron's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (ECF 17 ) is GRANTED. Both motions are granted as to Plaintiffs' claim for financial elder abuse, which is dismissed with prejudice, and granted as to Plaintiffs' request for declaratory judgment, which is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs may file an amended pleading within two weeks from the date of this Opinion and Order if they believe that additional allegations will cure the identified deficiencies. Signed on 1/25/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-01491-SI, 3:17-cv-01494-SI (mja)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?