Aazami v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Azhang Shaine Aazami
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01564
Filed: October 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Anna J. Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 12:2605 Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Opinion and Order. The Court GRANTS Wells Fargo's Request (# 44 ) for Judicial Notice, GRANTS Plaintiff's Request (# 62 ) for Judicial Notice, GRANTS Wells Fargo's Motion (# 65 ) to Strike, GRANTS Wells Fargos Amended Motion (# 57 ) for Summary Judgment, and GRANTS QLS's Motion (# 59 ) for Summary Judgment. IT IS SO ORDERED. See attached order for further details. Signed on 1/22/19 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jy)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Opinion and Order. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion (# 2 ) for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 2/6/18 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jy)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order 5 . Show Cause Hearing is set for 10/26/2017 at 02:30PM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Signed on 10/13/2017 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (See 3-page Order for details) (sss)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aazami v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azhang Shaine Aazami
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation of Washington
Represented By: John M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Anglin Flewelling Rasmussen Campbell & Trytten LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?