Bokenfohr v. Gladen et al
Plaintiff: Lori Bokenfohr
Defendant: Cynthia Gladen and Christine Guidera
Case Number: 3:2017cv01870
Filed: November 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Anna J. Brown
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1030(g) Fraud and Related Activity in Connection with Computers
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Opinion and Order. The Court GRANTS Gladen's Motion (# 121 ) for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court DIRECTS the parties to file a Joint Status Reportno later than September 9, 2019, to include a proposed case-managementschedule for moving this case forward as to all remaining issues. IT IS SO ORDERED. See attached order for further details. Signed on 8/22/19 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jy)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Opinion and Order. The Court GRANTS Gladen's Motion (# 37 ) to Quash Subpoena and DENIES as moot Gladen's Motion (# 37 )Protective Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 7/10/18 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jy)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Opinion and Order. The Court GRANTS Guidera's Motion (# 27 ) to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses as to Guidera's affirmative defense of in pari delicto and DEFERS ruling on Guidera's Motion as to her unclean-hands affirmative de fense. The Court GRANTS Gladen's Motion (# 28 ) for Leave to File FirstAmended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim as to Gladen's affirmative defenses of in pari delicto and laches and DEFERS ruling on Guidera's Motion as to her unclean-hands affirmative defense. The Court DIRECTS the parties to file no later than June 19, 2018, a stipulated agreement for the return and removal of Plaintiff's data from the SSD and Plaintiff's computer or other devices as set out in this Opinion and Order or to file a joint status report explaining why the parties have not stipulated to the return of the data as proposed.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 5/29/18 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jy)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bokenfohr v. Gladen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Bokenfohr
Represented By: Edward A. Piper
Represented By: Kristen L. Tranetzki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Gladen
Represented By: John J. Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Guidera
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?