de Borja et al v. Razon et al
Plaintiff: Makiling Farms, Inc. and Patrick R. de Borja
Defendant: John and/or Jane Does 1-20, Enrique R. Razon, Jr., ICTSI Oregon Inc. and International Container Terminal Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01131
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2018 Filing 10 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5461526. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to Esther Barnard Related Doc #6 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (nd)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Walter J. Scott, Jr for Makiling Farms, Inc.and Patrick R. de Borja. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5463107 issued. Signed on 7/2/2018 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
July 2, 2018 Filing 8 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Walter J. Scott, Jr. (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: wjscott. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
June 27, 2018 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Walter J. Scott, Jr. . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5463107. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Joshua)
June 27, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Refund Request Due, 5 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Ross, Joshua)
June 27, 2018 Filing 5 A duplicate payment in the amount of $400.00 was submitted by Patrick R. de Borja in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 7/9/2018. (ljp)
June 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to ICTSI Oregon Inc., International Container Terminal Services, Inc., Enrique R. Razon, Jr. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 issued summons, #2 issued summons) (ecp)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/25/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/26/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Joshua)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5461532 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Patrick R. de Borja, Makiling Farms, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4-1, #6 Exhibit 4-2, #7 Exhibit 4-3, #8 Exhibit 4-4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, part 1, #14 Exhibit 9, part 2, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Proposed Summons, #17 Proposed Summons, #18 Proposed Summons). (Ross, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: de Borja et al v. Razon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and/or Jane Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique R. Razon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICTSI Oregon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Container Terminal Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makiling Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua L. Ross
Represented By: Walter J. Scott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick R. de Borja
Represented By: Joshua L. Ross
Represented By: Walter J. Scott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?