Spencer v. International Dairy Queen, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mariel Spencer
Defendant: International Dairy Queen, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01252
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Frederick B. Burnside appearing on behalf of International Dairy Queen, Inc. Filed by on behalf of International Dairy Queen, Inc.. (Burnside, Frederick)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Kevin H. Kono appearing on behalf of International Dairy Queen, Inc. Filed by on behalf of International Dairy Queen, Inc.. (Kono, Kevin)
July 26, 2018 Filing 4 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by International Dairy Queen, Inc. waiver sent on 7/26/2018. Filed by Mariel Spencer. (Fuller, Michael)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to International Dairy Queen, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/13/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/13/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 12/13/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5480940 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Mariel Spencer against International Dairy Queen, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Fuller, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. International Dairy Queen, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariel Spencer
Represented By: Michael R. Fuller
Represented By: Kelly D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Dairy Queen, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick B. Burnside
Represented By: Kevin H. Kono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?