The Alger Funds et al v. Precision Castparts Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Alger Capital Appreciation Portfolio, Alger Dynamic Return Fund, LLC, Alger Global Growth Fund, The Alger Portfolios, The Alger Funds II, The Alger Institutional Funds, Alger American Asset Growth Fund, Alger Capital Appreciation Focus SMA Wrap Seed, Alger Capital Appreciation Institutional Fund, Alger Spectra Fund, Alger Large Cap Growth SMA Model, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, The Alger Funds, Alger Large Cap Growth Portfolio, Alger Capital Appreciation Fund, Alger Capital Appreciation Focus Fund, Alger Associates, Inc., Alger Capital Appreciation SMA Model, Alger Collective Trust Capital Appreciation Series and Alger SICAV
Defendant: Precision Castparts Corp., Mark Donegan and Shawn R. Hagel
Case Number: 3:2018cv01465
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mark Donegan, Shawn R. Hagel, Precision Castparts Corp.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/10/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/7/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/7/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (rs)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Return of Service (Attachments: #1 Summons - 2nd Defendant, #2 Summons - 3rd Defendant) (Kocher, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5511519 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Alger Capital Appreciation Institutional Fund, Alger Capital Appreciation SMA Model, Alger SICAV, Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund, Alger Global Growth Fund, The Alger Funds, Alger Spectra Fund, Alger Collective Trust Capital Appreciation Series, Alger Large Cap Growth SMA Model, Alger Large Cap Growth Portfolio, The Alger Portfolios, Alger American Asset Growth Fund, Alger Capital Appreciation Portfolio, Alger Capital Appreciation Focus SMA Wrap Seed, Alger Dynamic Return Fund, LLC, Alger Associates, Inc., The Alger Funds II, Alger Capital Appreciation Focus Fund, Alger Capital Appreciation Fund, The Alger Institutional Funds against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Attachment Rule 7.1 Statement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Kocher, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Alger Funds et al v. Precision Castparts Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Castparts Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Donegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn R. Hagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Capital Appreciation Portfolio
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Dynamic Return Fund, LLC
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Global Growth Fund
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Alger Portfolios
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Alger Funds II
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Alger Institutional Funds
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger American Asset Growth Fund
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Capital Appreciation Focus SMA Wrap Seed
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Capital Appreciation Institutional Fund
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Spectra Fund
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Large Cap Growth SMA Model
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Dynamic Opportunities Fund
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Alger Funds
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Large Cap Growth Portfolio
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Capital Appreciation Fund
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Capital Appreciation Focus Fund
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Capital Appreciation SMA Model
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger Collective Trust Capital Appreciation Series
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alger SICAV
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?