Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd. et al v. Precision Castparts Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Discovery Global Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd, Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd, Discovery Global Macro Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Focus Master Fund, Ltd, Discovery Global Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Focus Master Fund, Ltd. and Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd.
Defendant: Precision Castparts Corp., Shawn R. Hagel and Mark Donegan
Case Number: 3:2018cv01468
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
0 Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
1 Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Marco A. Hernandez to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (eo)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mark Donegan, Shawn R. Hagel, Precision Castparts Corp.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/14/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/14/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/14/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jtj)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons(Attachments: #1 Summons - 2nd Defendant, #2 Summons - 3rd Defendant) (Kocher, Scott) Modified on 8/16/2018 to correct event from Return of Service to Proposed Summons(jtj).
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5511760 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd, Discovery Global Macro Master Fund, Ltd., Discovery Global Focus Master Fund, Ltd, Discovery Global Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Attachment Rule 7.1 Statement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Kocher, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd. et al v. Precision Castparts Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discovery Global Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discovery Global Macro Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discovery Global Focus Master Fund, Ltd
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discovery Global Opportunity Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discovery Global Focus Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discovery Global Citizens Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Scott F. Kocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Castparts Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn R. Hagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Donegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?