Cahill et al v. Nike, Inc. Featured Case

A class action lawsuit filed against Nike by four female employees which claims violations of the Equal Pay Act (gender pay discrimination) and also claims the company ignored rampant sexual harassment.

Plaintiff: Kelly Cahill and Sara Johnston
Defendant: Nike, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01477
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Paul Papak
Referring Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 36 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Paul Papak to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (eo)
September 13, 2018 Filing 35 Consent to Join Law Suit of Meghan Grieve. Filed by Kelly Cahill, Sara Johnston. (Salerno Owens, Laura)
August 30, 2018 Filing 34 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Felicia A. Davis (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: fadavis. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Felicia A. Davis for Nike, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5536414 issued. Signed on 8/30/2018 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp)
August 30, 2018 Filing 32 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Zachary P. Hutton (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: zphutton. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Zachary P. Hutton for Nike, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5536405 issued. Signed on 8/30/2018 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp)
August 30, 2018 Filing 30 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Daniel Prince (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: dprince. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Prince for Nike, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5536400 issued. Signed on 8/30/2018 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #22 as follows: Answer deadline reset to 11/5/2018 for Defendant Nike Inc. (gm)
August 30, 2018 Filing 27 A duplicate payment in the amount of $300.00 was submitted by Nike, Inc. in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 9/10/2018. (ljp)
August 29, 2018 Filing 26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Felicia A. Davis . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5536414. Filed by Nike, Inc.. (Pedersen, Amy)
August 29, 2018 Filing 25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Zachary P. Hutton . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5536405. Filed by Nike, Inc.. (Pedersen, Amy)
August 29, 2018 Filing 24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel Prince . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5536400. Filed by Nike, Inc.. (Pedersen, Amy)
August 29, 2018 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Nike, Inc.. (Pedersen, Amy)
August 29, 2018 Filing 22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. Filed by Nike, Inc.. (Pedersen, Amy)
August 27, 2018 Filing 21 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #8 upon Nike, Inc. served on 8/16/2018 Filed by Sara Johnston; Kelly Cahill. (Salerno Owens, Laura)
August 24, 2018 Filing 20 Consent to Join Law Suit of Lindsay Elizabeth. Filed by Kelly Cahill, Sara Johnston. (Ho, Laura)
August 22, 2018 Filing 19 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Craig Ackermann (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: cackermann. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (jtj)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Craig Ackermann for Kelly Cahill and Sara Johnston. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5521292 issued. Signed on 8/22/2018 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (jtj)
August 22, 2018 Filing 17 Notification of CM/ECF Account for India Lin Bodien (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: ilbodien. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (jtj)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of India Lin Bodien for Kelly Cahill and Sara Johnston. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5521290 issued. Signed on 8/22/2018 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (jtj)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Craig Ackermann . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5521292. Filed by Kelly Cahill, Sara Johnston. (Salerno Owens, Laura)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney India Lin Bodien . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5521290. Filed by Kelly Cahill, Sara Johnston. (Salerno Owens, Laura)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katharine L. Fisher for Kelly Cahill and for Sara Johnston. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5519395 issued. Signed on 8/16/2018 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp)
August 16, 2018 Filing 14 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Byron Goldstein (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: bgoldstein. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Byron Goldstein for Kelly Cahill and Sara Johnston. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5519386 issued. Signed on 8/16/2018 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp)
August 16, 2018 Filing 12 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Laura L. Ho (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: llho. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Laura L. Ho for Kelly Cahill and Sara Johnston. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-55193 issued. Signed on 8/16/2018 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (ecp)
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Nike, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Paul Papak and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/14/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/14/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/14/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (jtj)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katharine L. Fisher . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5519395. Filed by Kelly Cahill, Sara Johnston. (Salerno Owens, Laura)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Byron Goldstein . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5519386. Filed by Kelly Cahill, Sara Johnston. (Salerno Owens, Laura)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laura L. Ho . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5519355. Filed by Kelly Cahill, Sara Johnston. (Salerno Owens, Laura)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 Consent to Join Law Suit . Filed by Kelly Cahill, Sara Johnston. (Salerno Owens, Laura)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Consent to Join Law Suit . Filed by Kelly Cahill, Sara Johnston. (Salerno Owens, Laura)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5514167 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Sara Johnston, Kelly Cahill against Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons). (Salerno Owens, Laura)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5514167 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Sara Johnston, Kelly Cahill against Nike, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Proposed Summons). (Salerno Owens, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cahill et al v. Nike, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nike, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon H. Scott
Represented By: Felicia A. Davis
Represented By: Daniel Prince
Represented By: Zachary P. Hutton
Represented By: Amy Joseph Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Cahill
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Represented By: Anna Marie Joyce
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Laura R. Salerno Owens
Represented By: India Lin Bodien
Represented By: Katharine L. Fisher
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Craig Ackermann
Represented By: Byron Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Johnston
Represented By: David B. Markowitz
Represented By: Anna Marie Joyce
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Represented By: Laura R. Salerno Owens
Represented By: India Lin Bodien
Represented By: Katharine L. Fisher
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Craig Ackermann
Represented By: Byron Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?