Hoffee v. Walmart Inc.

Plaintiff: Karen Hoffee
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01497
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING a Telephone Rule Conference for Tuesday, November 27, 2018, at 9:30AM. The court's conference line call-in information will be sent to counsel by separate entry. (peg)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Barhoum, John)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/14/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/14/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/14/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jtj)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal. Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Barhoum, John)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Barhoum, John)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Declaration of Jessica Lancaster in Support of Notice of Removal. Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service) (Barhoum, John)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 to Adverse Parties Filed by Walmart Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Barhoum, John)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV32153 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5517640 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Original Complaint). (Barhoum, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffee v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Represented By: Jessica Lewicki Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Hoffee
Represented By: Gary G. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?