Vetere v. Simple Finance Technology Corp.
Plaintiff: Kelly Valade Vetere and Kelly Vetere
Defendant: Simple Finance Technology Corp.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01504
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Simple Finance Technology Corp. served on 9/6/2018, answer due on 9/27/2018. (Burgess, John)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Simple Finance Technology Corp.. (Pelkey, Emma)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Simple Finance Technology Corp.. (Pelkey, Emma)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Simple Finance Technology Corp.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Kelly Vetere. (Burgess, John)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Simple Finance Technology Corp.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by Kelly Vetere. (Burgess, John)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/14/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/14/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/14/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5518565 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Kelly Valade Vetere against Simple Finance Technology Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Attorney info). (Burgess, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vetere v. Simple Finance Technology Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Valade Vetere
Represented By: Carl Lee Post
Represented By: Daniel J. Snyder
Represented By: John D. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Vetere
Represented By: Carl Lee Post
Represented By: Daniel J. Snyder
Represented By: John D. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simple Finance Technology Corp.
Represented By: Emma P. Pelkey
Represented By: Sharon C. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?