Columbia Riverkeeper v. United States Department Of Energy
Plaintiff: Columbia Riverkeeper
Defendant: United States Department Of Energy
Case Number: 3:2018cv01544
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 Amended Complaint . Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper against United States Department Of Energy. (Bahr, David)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Thursday, 12/13/2018 at 9:30AM. The court's conference line call-in information will be sent be separate sealed entry. (peg)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by United States Department Of Energy. (Danielson, Kevin)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon United States Department Of Energy served on 8/23/2018 Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper. (Johnson, Miles)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department Of Energy. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/20/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/22/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/22/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (joha)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper. (Bahr, David)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5526501 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper against United States Department Of Energy (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bahr, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia Riverkeeper v. United States Department Of Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department Of Energy
Represented By: Kevin C. Danielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Riverkeeper
Represented By: David A. Bahr
Represented By: Miles B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?