Cooper v. Applied Integrated Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Eric Cooper
Defendant: Applied Integrated Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01561
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: Oregon District Court
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2018 12 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court #10 . Filed by Applied Integrated Technologies, Inc.. (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
September 26, 2018 11 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #6 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Eric Cooper. (Brown, Stephanie)
September 17, 2018 10 Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Eric Cooper. (Brown, Stephanie)
September 13, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time. As to the Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #6 : Plaintiff's Response is due by 9/26/2018. Defendant's Reply is due by 10/22/2018. The Motion to Remand is due 9/17/2018. Defendant's Response is due 10/8/2018, and Plaintiff's Reply is due 10/22/2018. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
September 6, 2018 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #6 . Filed by Eric Cooper. (Brown, Stephanie)
August 30, 2018 7 Declaration of Vicki Redman in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Applied Integrated Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #6 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
August 30, 2018 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
August 27, 2018 5 Featured Case Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/26/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/24/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/24/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ecp)
August 24, 2018 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Applied Integrated Technologies, Inc.. (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
August 23, 2018 3 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Applied Integrated Technologies, Inc.. (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
August 23, 2018 2 Declaration of Vicki Redman . Filed by Applied Integrated Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
August 23, 2018 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV30041 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5529375 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Applied Integrated Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1). (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Applied Integrated Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Cooper
Represented By: Stephanie J. Brown
Represented By: David Arthur Schuck
Represented By: Karen A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Integrated Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Crabtree
Represented By: April L. Upchurch Fredrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?