Simms et al v. Intel Corporation
Plaintiff: Lori Howick, Eric Miller, Justin Whippo, Keith Allen Chick, Jimaya Gomez, DK Systems, LLC, Ashley Price, Veronica Gardner, Linda Phillips, Gerald Wilkie, Kenneth Woolsey, David Copeland, James Simms, Howard Kramer, Richard Basham, Jerry Peacock, Carter Wilson, Rick Snyder, Jessica Grosskopf, Marta Bolanos, Eugene Corderre, Delmita Boykins, Kathleen Greer, Intelligent Technology Integration Solution, LLC, Kristina Morin-Nieves, Sarah Stone, Hibbits Insurance, Inc., Zachary Richard, Harley Oda, John Nacci, Michael Dillon, Andrew Montoya, Gerald Mark Trubey, Ryan Clarke, Matthew Ficarelli and Jeffrey Crown
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv01567
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332cl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 34 Request for Judicial Notice Re: Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim(86 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 88 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 90 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 137 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 121 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 89 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 92 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 92 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 101 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 100 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 92 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 87 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 91 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 93 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 95 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 106 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 109 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 89 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 94 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 97 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 88 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 87 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 100 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 98 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 96 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 108 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 32 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 57 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 97 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 99 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 93 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 100 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 100 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 96 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 100 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 91 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI). Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lovett, Steven)
October 19, 2018 Filing 33 Declaration of Steven T. Lovett in Support of Intel's Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim(86 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 88 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 90 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 137 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 121 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 89 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 92 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 92 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 101 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 100 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 92 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 87 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 91 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 93 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 95 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 106 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 109 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 89 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 94 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 97 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 88 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 87 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 100 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 98 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 96 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 108 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 32 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 57 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 97 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 99 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 93 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 100 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 100 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 96 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 100 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 91 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lovett, Steven)
October 19, 2018 Filing 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lovett, Steven)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Pretrial Order No. 6 - Order Regarding Format for Court Technology Tutorial. Signed on 10/19/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon.Filed in all associated cases of 3:18-md-02828-SI. (mja)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Pretrial Order No. 5 - Protective Order and Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 502. Signed on 10/18/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Filed in all associated cases of 3:18-md-02828-SI. (mja)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Pretrial Order No. 4 - Order Establishing Protocol for Document Collection and Production. Signed on 10/18/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon.Filed in all associated cases: 3:18-md-02828-SI. (mja)
October 10, 2018 Filing 28 Notice of Association of Attorney Rachel C. Lee. of D. Keith Clouser Filed by All Defendants.Associated Cases: 3:18-md-02828-SI, 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 6:18-cv-00028-SI (Lee, Rachel)
October 4, 2018 Filing 27 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE: Status of case discussed as stated on the record on October 4, 2018, including, among other things: (a) Parties to confer and inform the Court by October 12 whether parties jointly request any changes to draft Pretrial Order No. 4 or draft Pretrial Order No. 5 (sent by email from the Court to counsel on October 2) and whether any party has any further comments on anything contained in either draft pretrial order; (b) parties to begin the process of conferring on a detailed joint discovery report to be filed by November 20 and discussed with the Court on December 6; (c) parties to continue to discuss proposed agenda and procedures for court technical tutorial to be held on February 8, 2019; (d) parties and their TAR consultants will meet and confer before the next monthly telephone status conference on November 8; and (e) at the parties' joint request, the page limits for Intel's Rule 12(b)(6) motion and Plaintiff's opposition are each enlarged from 35 pages to 50 pages. Christopher A. Seeger, Rosemary M. Rivas, Christopher Ayers, David Buchanan, and Jennifer S. Wagner present as counsel for plaintiffs. David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen, Daniel F. Katz, Rachel Rodman, Keith Clouser, Steven T. Lovett, and Rachael C. Lee present as counsel for defendant. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
October 2, 2018 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Lee, Rachel)
October 2, 2018 Filing 25 Notice of Association of Attorney Rachel C. Lee,Rachel S. Rodman for Intel Corporation. Filed by All Defendants. (Lee, Rachel)
October 2, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Association of Attorney Rachel C. Lee,David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen for Intel Corporation. Filed by All Defendants. (Lee, Rachel)
October 2, 2018 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance of Rachel C. Lee appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Lee, Rachel)
September 13, 2018 Filing 22 Supplement to Correspondence. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Proposed Form of Order or Judgment(74 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 75 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 65 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 117 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 66 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 8 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 40 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 89 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 59 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 92 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 104 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 59 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 60 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 91 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI), Request(82 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 106 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 94 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 62 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 61 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 10 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 86 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 42 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 93 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 91 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 77 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 61 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 119 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI), Proposed Form of Order or Judgment(74 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 90 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 91 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 65 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 59 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 7 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 66 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 58 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 116 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 39 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 103 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 58 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 64 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 88 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Katz, Daniel)
September 13, 2018 Filing 21 Supplement to Brief Regarding Proposed Orders.. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Brief,,,,,,,,, (105 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 76 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 92 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 41 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 9 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 93 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 60 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 66 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 90 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 60 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 118 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 61 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Wagner, Jennifer)
September 11, 2018 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance of Frederick S. Longer appearing on behalf of City of New Castle, Cole Phillips Filed by on behalf of City of New Castle, Cole Phillips.Associated Cases: 3:18-md-02828-SI, 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 6:18-cv-00028-SI (Longer, Frederick)
September 6, 2018 Filing 19 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE: Status of case discussed as stated on the record. Rosemary M. Rivas, Christopher A. Seeger, Christopher Ayers, David Buchanan, and Jennifer S. Wagner present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Daniel F. Katz, David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen, Rachel Rodman, Steven T. Lovett, and Rachael C. Lee present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Plaintiffs (ECF 123 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Docketed in all Member Cases. (mja)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order - The discovery and pretrial scheduling order (ECF #2 ) was entered in this case in error and is STRICKEN from the record. The deadlines and orders for this case can be found in the Lead Case 3:18-md-2828-SI Intel Corp. CPU Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 4, 2018 Filing 16 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Plaintiffs. Filed by Robert S. Key.Docketed in all Member Cases. (Weiner, Melissa)
August 30, 2018 Filing 15 Supplement to Brief Regarding Proposed Orders. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Brief,,,,,,,,, (105 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 76 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 92 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 85 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 41 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 9 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 93 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 60 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 66 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 90 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 60 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 118 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 61 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI).)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Wagner, Jennifer)
August 30, 2018 Filing 14 Affidavit of Emily Bigelow of Service by Mail of Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Jennifer)
August 30, 2018 Filing 13 Affidavit of Emily Bigelow of Service by Mail of Consolidated Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Wagner, Jennifer)
August 30, 2018 Filing 12 Supplement to Intel's Request re Proposed Forms of Order. Filed by All Defendants. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lovett, Steven)
August 29, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Intel Corporation waiver sent on 8/28/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Jennifer)
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 Request re Proposed Forms of Order. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lovett, Steven)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 Brief Regarding Proposed Orders. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Proposed Form of Order or Judgment(68 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 75 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 65 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 117 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 66 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 89 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 59 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 8 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 92 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 104 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 84 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 59 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 60 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 91 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 40 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI), Proposed Form of Order or Judgment(58 in 3:18-cv-00965-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00211-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00193-SI, 116 in 3:18-md-02828-SI, 39 in 3:18-cv-00935-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00689-SI, 74 in 6:18-cv-00028-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00697-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00666-SI, 79 in 3:18-cv-00687-SI, 103 in 3:18-cv-00590-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00578-SI, 77 in 3:18-cv-00695-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00413-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00696-SI, 72 in 3:18-cv-00667-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00693-SI, 80 in 3:18-cv-00688-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00665-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00579-SI, 67 in 3:18-cv-00668-SI, 68 in 3:18-cv-00448-SI, 76 in 3:18-cv-00686-SI, 69 in 3:18-cv-00671-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00692-SI, 71 in 3:18-cv-00389-SI, 74 in 3:18-cv-00690-SI, 83 in 3:18-cv-00698-SI, 75 in 3:18-cv-00694-SI, 90 in 3:18-cv-00684-SI, 91 in 3:18-cv-00591-SI, 81 in 3:18-cv-00258-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00670-SI, 70 in 3:18-cv-00669-SI, 58 in 3:18-cv-00966-SI, 65 in 3:18-cv-00489-SI, 59 in 3:18-cv-00820-SI, 7 in 3:18-cv-01567-SI, 73 in 3:18-cv-00757-SI, 64 in 3:18-cv-00740-SI, 78 in 3:18-cv-00685-SI, 66 in 3:18-cv-00534-SI, 82 in 3:18-cv-00691-SI, 88 in 3:18-cv-00710-SI).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Docketed in all Member Cases. (Wagner, Jennifer)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 Joint Proposed Form of Order Submitted re Order Governing Document Collection and Production Format. Filed by All Defendants. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lovett, Steven)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 Joint Proposed Form of Order Submitted re Protective Order and Order Pursuant to FRE 502. Filed by All Defendants. Docketed in all Member Cases. (Lovett, Steven)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Intelligent Technology Integration Solution, LLC. (Wagner, Jennifer)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Hibbits Insurance, Inc.. (Wagner, Jennifer)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by DK Systems, LLC. (Wagner, Jennifer)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Intel Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon (STRICKEN SEE ECF #17) Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/26/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/24/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/24/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jtj) Modified on 9/5/2018 (mja).
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Class Action Allegation Complaint Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5531188 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Matthew Ficarelli, Jessica Grosskopf, Ryan Clarke, Eugene Corderre, Zachary Richard, Howard Kramer, Eric Miller, James Simms, Marta Bolanos, Veronica Gardner, Richard Basham, Sarah Stone, Ashley Price, John Nacci, Keith Allen Chick, David Copeland, Rick Snyder, Harley Oda, Jerry Peacock, DK Systems, LLC, Kenneth Woolsey, Kristina Morin-Nieves, Gerald Wilkie, Andrew Montoya, Kathleen Greer, Lori Howick, Michael Dillon, Intelligent Technology Integration Solution, LLC, Linda Phillips, Justin Whippo, Jeffrey Crown, Delmita Boykins, Carter Wilson, Hibbits Insurance, Inc., Gerald Mark Trubey, Jimaya Gomez against Intel Corporation (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Wagner, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simms et al v. Intel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Howick
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Miller
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Whippo
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Allen Chick
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimaya Gomez
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DK Systems, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Price
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Gardner
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Phillips
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Wilkie
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Woolsey
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Copeland
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Simms
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Kramer
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Basham
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Peacock
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carter Wilson
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Snyder
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Grosskopf
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta Bolanos
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Corderre
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delmita Boykins
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Greer
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intelligent Technology Integration Solution, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Morin-Nieves
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Stone
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hibbits Insurance, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Richard
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harley Oda
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nacci
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dillon
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Montoya
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Mark Trubey
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Clarke
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Ficarelli
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Crown
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Joost
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Katz
Represented By: Rachel S. Rodman
Represented By: Steven T. Lovett
Represented By: David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen
Represented By: Rachel C. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?