Reba v. Commissioner Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Sherry Kathleen Reba
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv01577
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: Oregon District Court
0 Judge: John V Acosta
1 Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 10 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 10/18/2018, answer due on 2/15/2019. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (sss)
October 17, 2018 9 Return of Service Executed Service specifically made upon Regional Counsel or Agency, and the U.S. Attorney General. (sss)
October 15, 2018 8 Issued Summons as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint and Order to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service.) (tj)
September 25, 2018 7 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael W. Mosman to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (eo)
September 24, 2018 6 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge..
August 29, 2018 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
August 28, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER: GRANTING Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
August 28, 2018 3 Featured Case Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (jtj)
August 27, 2018 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Sherry Kathleen Reba. (Schneider, Merrill)
August 27, 2018 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Filed by Sherry Kathleen Reba against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Schneider, Merrill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reba v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Kathleen Reba
Represented By: Merrill Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?