United States of America v. Carlson et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Charles Harman, Karen L. Carson, Yamhill County, Oregon, Oregon Department of Revenue, Martin J. Strelecky, Teresa A. Strelecky, Julie M. Pettit, Ocwen Financial Corporation and Karen L. Carlson
Case Number: 3:2018cv01598
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING defendant OCWEN Financial Corporation's unopposed motion #11 for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint up to and including 11/1/18. (peg)
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation. (Meyer, Charles)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on Stipulation of Dismissal #9 of Defendant Julie Pettit with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 15th day of October, 2018, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 Stipulated Motion for dismissal of defendant Julie Pettit based upon disclaimer of interest. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stevko, Alexander)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING defendants Strelecky's unopposed motion #6 for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to plalintiff's amended complaint up to and including 11/19/18. (peg)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Proposed Order for a Hearing to Show Cause Granting Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Martin J. Strelecky. (Womac, Daniel)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Martin J. Strelecky. (Womac, Daniel)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Daniel A. Womac appearing on behalf of Martin J. Strelecky Filed by on behalf of Martin J. Strelecky. (Womac, Daniel)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Karen L. Carlson, Charles Harman, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Oregon Department of Revenue, Julie M. Pettit, Martin J. Strelecky, Teresa A. Strelecky, Yamhill County, Oregon. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Amended Complaint . Filed by United States of America against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons). (Stevko, Alexander)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/28/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/28/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/28/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sss)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United States of America against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons). (Stevko, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Carlson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen L. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamhill County, Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J. Strelecky
Represented By: Daniel A. Womac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa A. Strelecky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie M. Pettit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Represented By: Charles T. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen L. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander Stevko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?