Babcock v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lisa A. Babcock
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2018cv01619
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding Declaration #71 filed by Lisa A. Babcock. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. The Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record and, if necessary, regenerate the Notice of Electronic Filing to all parties: Page 3 of the Declaration (envelope) was upside-down. PDF corrected and replaced. NEF regenerated to all parties. (sss)
October 15, 2018 Filing 71 Declaration of Leslie W. O'Leary in Support of Motion for Stay #63 . Filed by Lisa A. Babcock. (sss) (Main Document 71 replaced on 10/22/2018) (sss).
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Order Terminating Melissa J. Healy as Pro Bono Counsel. Signed on 10/15/18 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (peg)
October 15, 2018 Filing 69 Pro Bono Appointment Response. Termination of the appointment is requested because plaintiff requested termination. Filed by Lisa A. Babcock. (Related document(s): Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel, #67 .) (Healy, Melissa)
October 15, 2018 Filing 68 Pro Bono Appointment Response. Termination of the appointment is requested because plaintiff requested termination. Filed by Lisa A. Babcock. (Related document(s): Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel, #67 .) (Healy, Melissa)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order Appointing Melissa J. Healy for Lisa A. Babcock as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment). Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 10/25/2018. Signed on 10/11/18 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (peg)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order Terminating Kenneth R. Davis, II as Pro Bono Counsel. Signed on 10/11/18 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (peg)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING plaintiff's unopposed motion #63 for stay of all proceedings up to and including 12/14/18, for potential counsel to review plaintiff's medical records. FURTHER ORDERED - SETTING a Telephone Status Conference for Monday, 12/17/18, at 9:30AM. The court's telephone conference line call-in information will be sent be separate sealed entry. (copy of this order mailed to plaintiff) (peg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 64 Pro Bono Appointment Response. Due to a conflict, termination of the appointment is requested. Filed by Lisa A. Babcock. (Related document(s): Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel, #61 .) (Davis, Kenneth)
October 9, 2018 Filing 63 Unopposed Motion for 60 Day Stay. Filed by Lisa A. Babcock. (joha)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel,, 60 , Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel, #61 . A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. The Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record and, if necessary, regenerate the Notice of Electronic Filing to all parties: STRIKING Document 60 ; operative appointment of pro bono counsel order is Document #61 . (peg)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order Appointing Kenneth R. Davis, II for Lisa A. Babcock as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment). Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 10/15/2018. Signed on 10/1/18 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (copy of this order mailed to plaintiff) (peg)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order Appointing Kenneth R. Davis, II for Lisa A. Babcock as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment). Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 10/15/2018. Signed on 10/1/18 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg) Modified on 10/1/2018 to strike event as proper document was not attached to this entry; see following entry (ECF #61) for order appointing Mr. Davis with attached document. (peg)
October 1, 2018 Filing 59 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Lisa Babcock a copy of Order Terminating Pro Bono Counsel #58 . (peg)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order Terminating Celia A. Barlow as Pro Bono Counsel. Signed on 10/1/18 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
September 28, 2018 Filing 57 Pro Bono Appointment Response. Termination of the appointment is requested because I am a sole practitioner and have had three cases unexpectedly enter litigation in State Court. I cannot give this matter the time or attention it requires.. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel, #56 .) (Barlow, Celia)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order Appointing Celia A. Barlow for Lisa A. Babcock as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment). Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 10/2/2018. Signed on 9/18/18 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (copy of this order mailed to plaintiff) (peg)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order Terminating Erica R. Tatoian as Pro Bono Counsel. Signed on 9/18/18 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (copy of this order mailed to plaintiff) (peg)
September 17, 2018 Filing 54 Pro Bono Appointment Response. Termination of the appointment is requested because insufficient experience. Filed by Lisa A. Babcock. (Related document(s): Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel, #53 .) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter) (Tatoian, Erica)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order Appointing Erica R. Tatoian for Lisa A. Babcock as Pro Bono Counsel (All Purpose Appointment). Counsel is to file the attached response form if representation is accepted, if a conflict of interest exists, or if termination of the appointment is requested for a reason other than a conflict of interest by 9/26/2018. Signed on 9/12/18 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (copy of this order mailed to plaintiff) (peg)
September 12, 2018 Filing 52 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Status Conference held by Judge Acosta. ORDER: (1) This matter is STAYED for the period of 9/12/18 through 10/12/18, while the court seeks pro bono representation for plaintiff. (2) If possible, the depositions of plaintiff and Dr. Tseng will be scheduled between 10/12/18 and 12/10/18. (3) Once the depositions are completed, defense counsel is to propose to the court a date for the filing of their responsive pleading to plainitff's complaint. Pro Se Plaintiff Lisa Babcock appeared by telephone. Renee Rothage appeared in-person as counsel for defendants. Richard Dye appeared by telephone as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Ryan White. Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta presiding. (copy of this entry mailed to plaintiff) (peg)
September 10, 2018 Filing 51 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Richard M. Dye (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: rmdye. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard M. Dye for Ethicon, Inc.,Richard M. Dye for Johnson & Johnson. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5544804 issued. Signed on 9/10/2018 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
September 10, 2018 Filing 49 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rothauge, Renee)
September 7, 2018 Filing 48 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Lisa Babcock a copy of Order on motion to withdraw as counsel of record 47 . (peg)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING Counsel Wes Parker's motion #45 for leave to withdraw his representation of plaintiff Lisa A. Babcock in this matter. Plaintiff shall at this point proceed pro se. Mr. Parker need not attend the in-person/phone conference set for 9/12/18, at 12:30PM Pacific Time. (peg)
September 7, 2018 Filing 44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard M. Dye . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5544804. Filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rothauge, Renee)
September 6, 2018 Filing 46 Declaration of Wes S. Larsen in Support of Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record #45 . Filed by Plaintiff's counsel. (peg)
September 6, 2018 Filing 45 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Filed by Plaintiff's counsel Wes Larsen. (peg)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING an in-person Status/Scheduling Conference for Wednesday, 9/12/2018 at 12:30PM in Portland Courtroom 11B before Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. Local counsel to appear in person. Plaintiff may appear in person or by telephone. Out of state counsel may appear by telephone. (Plaintiff notified by telephone and by email) (peg)
September 5, 2018 Filing 43 Letter from Plaintiff Lisa Babcock. (re Transfer of case) #36 ). Filed by Lisa A. Babcock. (peg)
September 5, 2018 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance of Renee E. Rothauge appearing on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Filed by on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rothauge, Renee)
September 5, 2018 Filing 40 Clerk's Notice of E-mail Notification of Case Assignment Notice (#39 ) and instructions regarding attorney admission sent to Jordan N. Walker, Kasey Mitchell Adams, Wes Scott Larsen, David B. Thomas, Christy D. Jones, and William M. Gage. (eo)
September 5, 2018 Filing 39 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (eo)
September 5, 2018 Filing 38 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:16-cv-05114. Electronic file received.
August 24, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #37 Joint Designation. ERROR: Image did not contain signature of counsel. CORRECTION: Image removed and replaced with corrected image. (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 37 JOINT DESIGNATION OF NON-PTO FILINGS IN RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Lisa A. Babcock to the Court's #36 Order. (Gage, William) (Modified on 8/24/2018 to remove and replace unsigned image and to add party filer)(ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Oregon, Portland Division pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); it is further ORDERED that within seven (7) days of this order, the parties may file a joint designation of any non-Pretrial Order filings from MDL 2327, 2:12-md-2327; immediately after the expiration of seven (7) days, the Clerk of this court is DIRECTED to transmit the following to the United States District Court for the District of Oregon, Portland Division: (1) a copy of the docket sheet for this case; (2) the entire file for this case; (3) the docket sheet for MDL 2327, 2:12-md-2327; (4) all PTOs entered in 2:12-md-2327; and (5) any other non-PTO filing from 2:12-md-2327 which the parties jointly designate. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/17/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; Chief District Judge of the United States District Court for the District of Oregon, Portland Division, counsel of record, and any unrepresented party) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 35 MAIL RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE: #27 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER sent to Lisa Babcock at 2808 W. Cherry Lane, Apt. J307, Boise, Idaho 83705. (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 34 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to the Court's #27 Memorandum Opinion & Order. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE by Lisa A. Babcock of Intent to Proceed Without Counsel and MOTION by Lisa A. Babcock for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of #25 Notice of Video Deposition of Lisa Babcock (Adams, Kasey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 31 LETTER to Honorable Judge Joseph Goodwin, from Lisa A. Babcock dated 6/4/2018, re: case status. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Envelope) (ts) (originally received to chambers)(Modified on 7/10/2018 to replace image with date-stamped image)(ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 30 LETTER to Honorable Joseph R. Goodwin, from Lisa A. Babcock dated 5/11/2018, re: case status. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Envelope) (ts) (originally received to chambers)(Modified on 7/10/2018 to replace image with date-stamped image)(ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 29 LETTER to Honorable Joseph R. Goodwin, from Lisa A. Babcock dated 4/14/2018, re: enclosing termination letter to counsel (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Envelope) (ts) (originally received to chambers)(Modified on 7/10/2018 to replace image with date-stamped image)(ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 28 LETTER to The Honorable Joseph R. Goodwin, from Lisa A. Babcock dated 4/13/2018, re: her current counsel and requesting a stay of action. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 (Redacted), #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Envelope) (ts) (originally received to chambers)(Modified on 7/10/2018 to replace image with date-stamped image and on 7/13/2018 to replace attachment # 3)(ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: #15 MOTION by Wes Scott Larsen to Withdraw as Attorney for on behalf of Lisa A. Babcock and #18 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss Non-Pelvic Mesh Cases Without Prejudice; the parties are DIRECTED to confer by no later than 8/03/2018 to determine the appropriate venue for this case, and to submit a joint venue recommendation to the court by 8/10/2018; this action is STAYED until 8/10/2018 to allow plaintiff to retain other counsel; plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a statement of intent to proceed without counsel or to have new counsel enter an appearance by 8/10/2018; if the plaintiff fails to do so, the Defendants may move the court for appropriate relief, including dismissal with prejudice; the #18 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss Non-Pelvic Mesh Cases Without Prejudice is DENIED; the Clerk is DIRECTED to remove this case from Ethicon Wave 8 and lift the 2327 Wave 8 flag from the docket sheet. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/3/2018. (cc: counsel of record; plaintiff Lisa A. Babcock, via certified mail, return receipt requested) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lisa A. Babcock for Responses to First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production. (Attachments: #1 Responses, #2 Envelope) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Lisa Babcock on 7/20/2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Adams, Kasey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #22 Response In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE by Lisa A. Babcock in opposition to #18 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss Non-Pelvic Mesh Cases Without Prejudice (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER The #19 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or Alternatively for Plaintiffs to Show Cause for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or for Alternative Relief, Request for Expedited Briefing is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/14/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: Cases Listed on Appendix A & B) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of #19 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or Alternatively for Plaintiffs to Show Cause for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or for Alternative Relief, Request for Expedited Briefing (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or Alternatively for Plaintiffs to Show Cause for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or for Alternative Relief, Request for Expedited Briefing and Supporting Memorandum (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss Non-Pelvic Mesh Cases Without Prejudice (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Walker, Jordan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 16 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Lisa A. Babcock. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION by Wes Scott Larsen to Withdraw as Attorney for on behalf of Lisa A. Babcock (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Larsen, Wes) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
April 7, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kasey Mitchell Adams on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Adams, Kasey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan N. Walker on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Jordan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of #11 Notice of Videotaped Deposition (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Daniel N. Tseng on 4/30/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Jones, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
July 27, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
July 27, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
July 12, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
June 22, 2016 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Johnson & Johnson, re: #4 Amended Short Form Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (skh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
June 21, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Lisa A. Babcock for Johnson & Johnson, re: #4 Amended Short Form Complaint. (Larsen, Wes) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
June 20, 2016 Filing 4 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Lisa A. Babcock against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Larsen, Wes) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
June 7, 2016 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 233 (Order Granting Motion re: Interim Reimbursement of Costs) entered on 05/05/2016 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
June 7, 2016 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kll) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]
June 6, 2016 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4641508. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kll) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/5/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babcock v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Renee E. Rothauge
Represented By: Kasey Mitchell Adams
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Jordan N. Walker
Represented By: Richard M. Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Renee E. Rothauge
Represented By: Kasey Mitchell Adams
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Jordan N. Walker
Represented By: Richard M. Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa A. Babcock
Represented By: Wes Scott Larsen
Represented By: Melissa J. Healy
Represented By: Kenneth R. Davis, II
Represented By: Celia A. Barlow
Represented By: Erica R. Tatoian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?