Pineda et al v. Ratliff et al
Plaintiff: Tim Nay, Angela Pineda De Figueroa, Mirian Diaz Pineda and Ramon De Jesus Pineda
Defendant: Progressive Logistics, Howard Pels, Pride Transport, Inc. and Geren Ratliff
Case Number: 3:2018cv01630
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 26 Affidavit of Service upon Geren Ratliff served on 10/5/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Soran, Cameron)
November 1, 2018 Filing 25 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
November 1, 2018 Filing 24 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
October 31, 2018 Filing 23 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Setting a Rule 16 Conference for Monday, December 3, 2018, at 2:30 PM by telephone. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (phone number to be provided via separate e-mail) five minutes before the scheduled conference time. The court will join the conference call at the appointed time. The parties are to use land-line telephones, as the Court prohibits the use of speaker phones, cell phones and headsets. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
October 26, 2018 Filing 21 Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Soran, Cameron)
October 25, 2018 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance of M. Casey Gibbens appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Gibbens, M.)
October 16, 2018 Filing 19 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jonathan A. Burky (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jaburky. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan A. Burky for Pride Transport, Inc. and Geren Ratliff. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5595109 issued. Signed on 10/16/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
October 16, 2018 Filing 17 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Earle Q. Bravo (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: eqbravo. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Earle Q. Bravo for Pride Transport, Inc. and Geren Ratliff. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5595068. issued. Signed on 10/16/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan A. Burky . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5595109. Filed by Pride Transport, Inc., Geren Ratliff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Other Federal Court Admissions) (Nye, Christopher)
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Earle Q. Bravo . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5595068. Filed by Pride Transport, Inc., Geren Ratliff. (Nye, Christopher)
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance of Cameron Soran appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Soran, Cameron)
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Progressive Logistics, Howard Pels. (Williams, Brian)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Howard Pels, Progressive Logistics. (Williams, Brian)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 Demand for Jury Trial by Howard Pels, Progressive Logistics . Filed by Howard Pels, Progressive Logistics. (Williams, Brian)
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 Demand for Jury Trial by Pride Transport, Inc., Geren Ratliff . Filed by Pride Transport, Inc., Geren Ratliff. (Nye, Christopher)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 Answer to Complaint . Filed by Geren Ratliff, Pride Transport, Inc.. (Nye, Christopher)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Joinder in Notice of Removal by Defendants Geren Ratliff and Pride Transport, Inc. Filed by Howard Pels, Progressive Logistics. (Williams, Brian)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Robert J. Harris appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Harris, Robert)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Pride Transport, Inc.. (Nye, Christopher)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of E-Mailing Counsel M. Casey Gibbens and Cameron Soran Discovery order #3 and information regarding admissions to the Federal Bar for the District of Oregon. (ecp)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/4/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/4/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 2/4/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by PRIDE TRANSPORT, INC.. (Nye, Christopher)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV34341 from Multnomah County Circuit. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5544116 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by PRIDE TRANSPORT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3). (Nye, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pineda et al v. Ratliff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Logistics
Represented By: Brian B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Pels
Represented By: Brian B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pride Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Nye
Represented By: Jonathan A. Burky
Represented By: Earle Q. Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geren Ratliff
Represented By: Christopher J. Nye
Represented By: Jonathan A. Burky
Represented By: Earle Q. Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Nay
Represented By: Cameron Soran
Represented By: M. Casey Gibbens
Represented By: Robert J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Pineda De Figueroa
Represented By: Cameron Soran
Represented By: M. Casey Gibbens
Represented By: Robert J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirian Diaz Pineda
Represented By: Cameron Soran
Represented By: M. Casey Gibbens
Represented By: Robert J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon De Jesus Pineda
Represented By: Cameron Soran
Represented By: M. Casey Gibbens
Represented By: Robert J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?