D.E. v. American Airlines, et al
Plaintiff: D E and D. E.
Defendant: American Airlines and Does 1-25
Case Number: 3:2018cv01649
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of John Thomas Fetters appearing on behalf of American Airlines Filed by on behalf of American Airlines. (Fetters, John)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by American Airlines. (Jorgensen, Caryn)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by American Airlines. (Jorgensen, Caryn)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen appearing on behalf of American Airlines Filed by on behalf of American Airlines. (Jorgensen, Caryn)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Amended Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/9/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 2/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sss)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Honorable Stanley A. Bastian and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/9/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 2/8/2019. Ordered by Honorable Stanley A. Bastian. (sss)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5548143 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by D E against All Defendants. (Lawrence, Efrem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.E. v. American Airlines, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D E
Represented By: Efrem B. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. E.
Represented By: Efrem B. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines
Represented By: John Thomas Fetters
Represented By: Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?