Ramos v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Petitioner: Alan Marcelo Vazquez Ramos
Respondent: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 3:2018cv01714
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Order 4 sent to Alan Marcelo Vazquez Ramos at Northern Oregon Regional Corrections Facility returned as undeliverable. (gw)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Alan Marcelo Vazquez Ramos at 19655 SW 65th Ave Apt. 35, Tualatin, OR 97062 regarding Order 4 . (joha)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. On 9/27/2018, the Court mailed a copy of the Notice of Case Assignment (ECF No. #2 ) to Petitioner. On 10/15/2018, the postal service returned the case assignment order as undeliverable (ECF No. #3 ). Pursuant to Local Rule 83-10, a party not represented by counsel has a continuing responsibility to notify the Clerk's Office whenever his or her mailing address changes. When mail from the Court to a party is returned by the postal service as undeliverable due to the lack of a current address, and the party's failure to notify the Court of a change of address continues for sixty days, the Court may dismiss the action. LR 83-12. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner shall filed a Notice of Change of Address within 60 days of this order, or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Petitioner is advised that failure to file a change of address or show cause will result in the dismissal of this proceeding for lack of prosecution. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Copy of order mailed to Petitioner.) (gw)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Notice of Case Assignment #2 sent to Alan Marcelo Vazquez Ramos returned as undeliverable. (joha)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha) (Copy Mailed to Petitioner.)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241- Federal). Filing Fee in amount of $5.00 collected. Filed by Alan Marcelo Vazquez Ramos against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alan Marcelo Vazquez Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?