Diamond v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Plaintiff: William A. Diamond
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01746
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: Oregon District Court
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 14 Reply to Motion to Remand to State Court #10 . Filed by William A. Diamond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (rs)
October 29, 2018 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Laurick, James)
October 23, 2018 12 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court #10 . Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Laurick, James)
October 9, 2018 11 Memorandum in Support. Filed by William A. Diamond. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand #10 .) (rs)
October 9, 2018 10 Motion to Remand to State Court. Filed by William A. Diamond. (rs)
October 9, 2018 9 Clerk's Notice of Mailing regarding Order on motion for extension of time to answer a Complaint 8 mailed to Plaintiff 10/9/2018. (mja)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER - Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #6 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 10/29/2018. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
October 8, 2018 7 Declaration of James P. Laurick in Support of Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #6 .) (Laurick, James)
October 8, 2018 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Laurick, James)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding Clerks Notice of Mailing 4 . A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. The Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record and, if necessary, regenerate the Notice of Electronic Filing to all parties: Mailing of Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order will not be generated by the court, rather it will be generated by the attorney representing Defendant. NEF regenerated. (rs)
October 1, 2018 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to William A. Diamond, regarding Discovery order, #3 . (rs)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/29/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/28/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 2/28/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (rs)
October 1, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Laurick, James)
October 1, 2018 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV37448 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5577099 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Laurick, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: James P. Laurick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?