Bautista et al v. Unigroup, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Bautista and Susana Bautista
Defendant: Unigroup, Inc. and Mayflower Transit, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01759
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 Answer to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand . Filed by Mayflower Transit, LLC. (Artman, David)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #6 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 11/23/2018. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Susana Bautista, Alexander Bautista against Mayflower Transit, LLC. (Pickett, J.)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 Declaration of David C. Clukey . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #6 .) (Artman, David)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by All Defendants. (Artman, David)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #3 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 11/8/2018. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Artman, David)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint. Filed by All Defendants. (Artman, David)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/31/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/4/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/4/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (sss)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV32343 from Clackamas County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5579764 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Mayflower Transit, LLC, Unigroup, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3). (Artman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bautista et al v. Unigroup, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Bautista
Represented By: Ron K. Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susana Bautista
Represented By: Ron K. Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unigroup, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Artman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayflower Transit, LLC
Represented By: David E. Artman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?