Alonso v. Mount Hood Community College District
Plaintiff: Alexandro Alonso
Defendant: Mount Hood Community College District
Case Number: 3:2018cv01775
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Cause of Action: 29:0794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference. Amendment to Pleadings/Joining of Parties due 3/1/2019. Discovery is to be completed by 5/17/2019. The last date to file any discovery motion is 4/16/2019, and responses to such motions are due no later than seven (7) calendar days after the initiating motion is filed; no replies are permitted for discovery motions. Joint Status Report after conferral re Dispositive motions, including ADR information and proposed case management schedule, due no later than 5/17/2019. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/21/2019 at 3:00 PM in Portland by telephone before Judge Anna J. Brown. Craig A. Crispin present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Beth Plass present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Jill Jessup. Judge Anna J. Brown presiding. (jy)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 Joint Status Report . Filed by Mount Hood Community College District. (Vickers, Karen)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is set for 11/13/2018 at 3:00 PM in Portland by telephone before Judge Anna J. Brown. Before the Conference, at a minimum counsel must conduct real-time conferral by telephone to prepare a proposed case-management schedule to be submitted to the Court prior to the Rule 16 Conference. The parties shall submit a written joint status report (to include proposed case management schedule) no later than 11/7/2018 that include deadlines to complete discovery, to file dispositive motions, and for trial. Parties shall also determine whether they agree to forgo the disclosures required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), and file separately with the Clerk of Court the form required by LR 26-2 no later than 11/7/2018. (jy)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Mount Hood Community College District. (Vickers, Karen)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 2/4/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/4/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/4/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (rs)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV40426 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5583936 issued.. Filed by Mount Hood Community College District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet). (Vickers, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alonso v. Mount Hood Community College District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandro Alonso
Represented By: Craig A. Crispin
Represented By: Ashley A. Marton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Hood Community College District
Represented By: Beth Plass
Represented By: Karen M. Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?