Northwest Environmental Advocates v. Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service
Plaintiff: Northwest Environmental Advocates
Defendant: Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service
Case Number: 3:2018cv01777
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Revising Case Schedule #9 . A Joint Status Report is due by 2/1/2019. Signed on 11/25/2018 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 Joint Motion for Revised Case Schedule. Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bruden, Emma)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance of Kevin C. Danielson appearing on behalf of Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service Filed by on behalf of Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service. (Danielson, Kevin)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Service by Northwest Environmental Advocates Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Bruden, Emma)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service served on 10/11/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Bruden, Emma)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel: Judge Hernandez expects the vast majority of civil cases in which all parties are represented by counsel, to be tried within 18 months of the date of filing. Additional information about case scheduling and guidelines for civil cases assigned to Judge Hernandez may be found on his page on the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon website: https://ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/court-info/judges/judge-hernandez. (jp)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj) (jtj).
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/6/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jtj)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Bruden, Emma)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5584129 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates against Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Bruden, Emma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Environmental Advocates v. Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Environmental Advocates
Represented By: Emma A.O. Bruden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service
Represented By: Kevin C. Danielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?