McKean v. Internal Revenue Service et al

Plaintiff: Caleb D. McKean
Defendant: Metabank and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 3:2018cv01829
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice of Mailing regarding Judgment #11 mailed to plaintiff 11/28/2018. (mja)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Judgment - Because the plaintiff has not filed an amended complaint that cures the defects in plaintiff's original complaint as noted in the Courts ORDER (ECF #9 ), IT IS ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED. Signed on 11/28/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 Notice. Filed by Caleb D. McKean. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (sss)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order - Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF #6 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF #2 ), however, fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, and thus Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF #2 ) is DISMISSED. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before November 19, 2018, if he can cure the defects noted in this Order. If no amended complaint is filed, the Court will enter a Judgment dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed on 11/1/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Copy mailed to Plaintiff on 11/1/2018 (mja)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons. Filed by Caleb D. McKean. (sss)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Caleb D. McKean. (sss)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (sss)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing on 10/25/2018 regarding Order 4 mailed to Plaintiff together with an application to proceed in forma pauperis. (mja)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order - Pursuant to LR 3-4(a), advance payment of all required fees or the filing of an application to proceed in forma pauperis must occur before the Clerk's Office can provide any services covered under the Schedule of Fees adopted by the Judicial Conference of the United States. In this case, Plaintiff filed an application to proceed in formal pauperis, but the application was incomplete and only the first page of the application was sent to the Clerk's Office. Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to either pay the appropriate filing fee in this case or file an amended application to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to mail to Plaintiff a copy of this order together with the form application to proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to plaintiff Caleb D. McKean this date.) (sss)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Caleb D. McKean against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (sss)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. (Form Incomplete - only 1 page submitted) Filed by Caleb D. McKean. (sss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKean v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metabank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb D. McKean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?