Rhapsody Real Estate, LLC v. United States of America, Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: Rhapsody Real Estate, LLC
Defendant: United States of America, Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 3:2018cv01874
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Rhapsody Real Estate, LLC against United States of America, Internal Revenue Service. (Phed, Robert)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING the unopposed motion #7 to extend time as follows: (1) Plaintiff is to file its amended complaint no later than 12/21/18. (2) Defendant to file an answer to the amended complaint on or before 1/3/19. (peg)
December 16, 2018 Filing 7 First Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Passannante, Mark)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING as amended by the court defendant's unopposed motion #5 for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Defendant may have up to and including 12/17/18, in which to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. (peg)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by United States of America, Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stevko, Alexander)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 2/22/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/25/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (joha)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING defendant's unopposed motion #2 to extend their time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint, up to and including 12/3/18. (peg)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by United States of America, Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stevko, Alexander)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV43271 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)). Filed by United States of America, Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Record). (Stevko, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhapsody Real Estate, LLC v. United States of America, Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Alexander Stevko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhapsody Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Robert S. Phed
Represented By: Mark G. Passannante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?