Griffith v. PeaceHealth
Plaintiff: Donald Griffith
Defendant: PeaceHealth
Case Number: 3:2018cv01882
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Donald Griffith. (Fuller, Michael)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to PeaceHealth served on 10/26/2018, answer due on 11/16/2018. (Fuller, Michael)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to PeaceHealth. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/25/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/25/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (joha)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5610427 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Donald Griffith against PeaceHealth (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Fuller, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffith v. PeaceHealth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Griffith
Represented By: Michael R. Fuller
Represented By: Kelly D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PeaceHealth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?