United States of America v. Park

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Karen Park and Karen J. Park
Case Number: 3:2018cv01904
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Stipulation Requesting 30 Day Extension of Time #5 for Defendant Karen J. Park to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 1/28/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer , with Karen Park. Filed by United States of America. (Cerling, Dylan)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service upon Karen J. Park served on 12/5/2018 Filed by United States of America. (Cerling, Dylan)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Karen J. Park. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/28/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/1/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (joha)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United States of America against Karen Park (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Karen Park Summons). (Cerling, Dylan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen J. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Dylan C. Cerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?