United States of America, for the use and benefit of Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. v. Nova Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America, for the use and benefit of Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.
Defendant: Nova Group, Inc., Federal Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01905
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3133
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Setting a Rule 16 Conference for Friday, January 25, 2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (phone number to be provided via separate e-mail) five minutes before the scheduled conference time. The court will join the conference call at the appointed time. The parties are to use land-line telephones, as the Court prohibits the use of speaker phones, cell phones and headsets. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to giselle_williams@ord.uscourts.gov, by noon the day before the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (MacKendrick, Andrew)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, Counterclaim United States of America, for the use and benefit of Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. Filed by Nova Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company. (MacKendrick, Andrew)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Dan Gragg is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Steven F. Cade Filed by All Defendants. (MacKendrick, Andrew)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #7 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 12/14/2018. Ordered on 11/26/2018 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
November 23, 2018 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by All Defendants. (Cade, Steven)
November 23, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Steven F. Cade appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Cade, Steven)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/28/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/1/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 4/1/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (rs)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Use Plaintiff Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. Filed by United States of America, for the use and benefit of Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.. (Hookland, Douglas)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5617253 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United States of America, for the use and benefit of Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons). (Hookland, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America, for the use and benefit of Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. v. Nova Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nova Group, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Gragg
Represented By: Steven F. Cade
Represented By: Andrew MacKendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Gragg
Represented By: Steven F. Cade
Represented By: Andrew MacKendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Gragg
Represented By: Steven F. Cade
Represented By: Andrew MacKendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, for the use and benefit of Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Robert Hookland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?