Singh et al v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: Gurpreet Singh and Pachattar Singh
Defendant: Field Office Dir. Richard L Miller, Richard Ives, Ronald D Vitiello, Hugh J. Hurwitz, Kirstjen Michelle Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Donald J. Trump, Field Office Director, Portland Field Office of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Donald Trump, Acting Director of the Federal Bureau of Prisons, Acting Director, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security and Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 3:2018cv01912
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000bb
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Federal Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Stay of Answer Deadline due to Lapse of Appropriations #6 . The Federal Defendants' answer deadline is Stayed in this case until Department of Justice attorneys are permitted to resume their usual civil litigation functions. Counsel shall notify the Court as soon as Congress has appropriated funds for the Department and move to extend deadlines accordingly. (gm)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Stay of Defendants' Answer Deadline in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Filed by All Defendants. (ul-Haq, Ubaid)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on All Defendants Filed by All Plaintiffs. (McHenry, Matthew)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Ubaid ul-Haq appearing on behalf of All Defendants in their Official Capacities Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (ul-Haq, Ubaid)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Acting Director of the Federal Bureau of Prisons, Acting Director, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director, Portland Field Office of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Richard Ives, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Donald Trump. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/4/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/1/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 4/1/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (joha)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5619404 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Gurpreet Singh, Pachattar Singh against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (McHenry, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Dir. Richard L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Ives
Represented By: Ubaid ul-Haq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh J. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Michelle Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B. Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Director, Portland Field Office of Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Ubaid ul-Haq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Represented By: Ubaid ul-Haq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director of the Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Ubaid ul-Haq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Ubaid ul-Haq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Ubaid ul-Haq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Ubaid ul-Haq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurpreet Singh
Represented By: Tiffany A. Harris
Represented By: Matthew G. McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pachattar Singh
Represented By: Tiffany A. Harris
Represented By: Matthew G. McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?