Front Range Equine Rescue v. Zinke et al
Plaintiff: Front Range Equine Rescue
Defendant: Brian Steed, Ryan Zinke and Jeffrey Rose
Case Number: 3:2018cv01983
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 16 Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (Healy, Melissa)
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 Stipulation of Dismissal by All Defendants. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Motion to Vacate and Remand, #2 Attachment IBLA Order) (Turner, Frederick)
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-02200. Electronic file received.
November 15, 2018 Case transferred to the USDC for the District of Oregon, pursuant to Court Order entered 11/5/2018. Sent to Court by extraction. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #13 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Case. Defendants propose to transfer this case to the District of Oregon, and Plaintiff does not oppose this request. 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) provides that "[f]or the convenience of parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice, a district court may transfer any civil action to any other district or division where it might have been brought." First, as set forth in Defendants' Motion, because two Defendants in this action reside in the District of Oregon, and a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred there, this case "might have been brought" in the District of Oregon. Second, again as set forth in the Motion, the balance of the interests (both public and private) weigh strongly in favor of transfer. The challenged agency action will take place in the District of Oregon, as did the agency's decision to proceed with it. Neither Plaintiff nor the events giving rise to the lawsuit are connected to the District of Columbia. And two other cases with substantially overlapping claims, one of which was filed before this case, are now pending in the District of Oregon. Therefore, the Court concludes in its discretion that for the convenience of the parties and witnesses, and in the interest of justice, this case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the District of Oregon. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/5/2018. (lctjk3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case by JEFFREY ROSE, BRIAN STEED, RYAN ZINKE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Environmental Assessment for 2018 Study, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Office of Inspector General Report, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Environmental Assessment for 2016 Proposed Study, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Decision Record for 2018 Study, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Declaration of Robert Sharp)(Turner, Frederick) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Harter Turner on behalf of All Defendants (Turner, Frederick) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Bruce A. Wagman is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/18/2018. (lctjk3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Molly L. Wiltshire is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/18/2018. (lctjk3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JEFFREY ROSE served on 10/2/2018 (Skinner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BRIAN STEED served on 10/9/2018 (Skinner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RYAN ZINKE served on 10/9/2018 (Skinner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/9/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/8/2018. (Skinner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/09/2018. (Skinner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to JEFFREY ROSE, BRIAN STEED, RYAN ZINKE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Molly Lauren Wiltshire, :Firm- Schiff Hardin LLP, :Address- 233 S Wacker Drive, Suite 7100. Phone No. - 3122585500. Fax No. - 3122585600 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5702109. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FRONT RANGE EQUINE RESCUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Molly L Wiltshire, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Skinner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Bruce A. Wagman, :Firm- Schiff Hardin LLP, :Address- One Market Street, Spear Tower, 31st Fl. Phone No. - 415-901-8762. Fax No. - 415-901-8701 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5702063. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FRONT RANGE EQUINE RESCUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bruce A. Wagman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Skinner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FRONT RANGE EQUINE RESCUE. Case related to Case No. 3:18-cv-01691 (D. Oregon). (Skinner, Jeffrey) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/26/2018) (zjd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FRONT RANGE EQUINE RESCUE. (Skinner, Jeffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JEFFREY ROSE, BRIAN STEED, and RYAN ZINKE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5701627) filed by FRONT RANGE EQUINE RESCUE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(ztnr) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/15/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Front Range Equine Rescue v. Zinke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Front Range Equine Rescue
Represented By: Jeffrey David Skinner
Represented By: Molly L. Wiltshire
Represented By: Bruce A. Wagman
Represented By: Melissa J. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Steed
Represented By: Frederick Harter Turner
Represented By: Frederick H. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Represented By: Frederick Harter Turner
Represented By: Frederick H. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Rose
Represented By: Frederick Harter Turner
Represented By: Frederick H. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?