Anderson v. Columbia County et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Anderson
Defendant: Columbia County, John Does 1-6 and Bryan Cutright
Case Number: 3:2018cv02058
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge Acosta- regarding Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #15 . Motion will be taken under advisement as of 3/1/2019. (kms)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Johnstun, Jacob)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 Reply (titled "State Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response [Dkt #13] to Defendants Bryan Cutright's and John Doe #1's Motion to Dismiss"). Filed by Bryan Cutright. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #13 .) (Johnson, Craig)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 Response to Motion to Dismiss (titled "Defendants Bryan Cutright and John Doe #1's Motion to Dismiss") #10 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Johnstun, Jacob)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Monday, 3/25/2019 at 10:00AM. The court's conference line call-in information will be sent to counsel by separate sealed entry. (peg)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - Defendants Cutright and John Doe #1's Motion to Dismiss #10 will be taken under advisement as of 2/6/2019. (peg)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to Dismiss (titled "Defendants Bryan Cutright and John Doe #1's Motion to Dismiss"). Filed by Bryan Cutright. (Johnson, Craig)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Counterclaim Sandra Anderson. Filed by Columbia County. (Lewis, David)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Columbia County served on 12/11/2018, answer due on 1/2/2019. (Johnstun, Jacob)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Bryan Cutright served on 12/11/2018, answer due on 1/2/2019. (Johnstun, Jacob)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Columbia County, Bryan Cutright. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Filed by Sandra Anderson. (Johnstun, Jacob)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by Sandra Anderson. (Johnstun, Jacob)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/3/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/3/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/3/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jtj)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Sandra Anderson. (Johnstun, Jacob)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5649772 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Sandra Anderson against All Defendants. (Johnstun, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Columbia County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia County
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Cutright
Represented By: Craig M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Anderson
Represented By: Jacob Johnstun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?