Morris v. Electro Scientific Industries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Brian Morris
Defendant: Frederick A. Ball, Richard H. Wills, Raymond A. Link, Laurence E. Cramer, Electro Scientific Industries, Inc., Lynne J. Camp and Michael D. Burger
Case Number: 3:2018cv02064
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and to Stay Other Pending Court Deadlines Complaint, #1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Angeli, David)
December 12, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance Filed by Frederick A. Ball, Michael D. Burger, Lynne J. Camp, Laurence E. Cramer, Electro Scientific Industries, Inc., Raymond A. Link, Richard H. Wills. (Shechter, Neal)
December 6, 2018 Filing 17 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Katherine L. Henderson (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: klhenderson. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katherine L. Henderson for Frederick A. Ball, Michael D. Burger, Lynne J. Camp, Laurence E. Cramer, Electro Scientific Industries, Inc., Raymond A. Link, and Richard H. Wills. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5657408 issued. Signed on 12/6/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
December 6, 2018 Filing 15 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Boris Feldman (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: bfeldman. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Boris Feldman for Frederick A. Ball, Michael D. Burger, Lynne J. Camp, Laurence E. Cramer, Electro Scientific Industries, Inc., Raymond A. Link, and Richard H. Wills. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5657400 issued. Signed on 12/6/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
December 5, 2018 Filing 13 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Richard H. Wills waiver sent on 12/3/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 12 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Raymond A. Link waiver sent on 12/3/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Laurence E. Cramer waiver sent on 12/3/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Lynne J. Camp waiver sent on 12/3/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Michael D. Burger waiver sent on 12/3/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Frederick A. Ball waiver sent on 12/3/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Electro Scientific Industries, Inc. waiver sent on 12/3/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ross, Michael)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine Henderson . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5657408. Filed by All Defendants. (Angeli, David)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Boris Feldman . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5657400. Filed by All Defendants. (Angeli, David)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Electro Scientific Industries, Inc.. (Angeli, David)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance of David H. Angeli appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Angeli, David)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/1/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/29/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 4/29/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5651318 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Brian Morris against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Attachment PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Ross, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Electro Scientific Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick A. Ball
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Katherine L. Henderson
Represented By: Neal S. Shechter
Represented By: David H. Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H. Wills
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Katherine L. Henderson
Represented By: Neal S. Shechter
Represented By: David H. Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond A. Link
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Katherine L. Henderson
Represented By: Neal S. Shechter
Represented By: David H. Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence E. Cramer
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Katherine L. Henderson
Represented By: Neal S. Shechter
Represented By: David H. Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electro Scientific Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Katherine L. Henderson
Represented By: Neal S. Shechter
Represented By: David H. Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne J. Camp
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Katherine L. Henderson
Represented By: Neal S. Shechter
Represented By: David H. Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Burger
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Katherine L. Henderson
Represented By: Neal S. Shechter
Represented By: David H. Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Morris
Represented By: Michael J. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?