Pacific Gulf Shipping Co. v. Adamastos Shipping & Trading S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.
Defendant: Phoenix Shipping & Trading S.A., Blue Wall Shipping Ltd., Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A., Adamastos Shipping & Trading S.A., Efstathios Gourdomichalis, Thalassa Holdings S.A., Alastor Marine S.A. and George Gourdomichalis
Interested Party: Al-Saeed Trading Company, Y.S.C. and Medmar Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02076
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER - Defendant Vigorous Shipping's Motion to Bifurcate #81 is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (pg)
January 30, 2019 Filing 81 Motion to Bifurcate Defendant Vigorous Shipping & Trading's Motion for Bifurcated Trial and Expedited Trial. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Muranovic, Sanja)
January 30, 2019 Filing 80 Notice of Appearance of Valerie I. Holder appearing on behalf of Medmar Inc. Limited Notice of Appearance Filed by on behalf of Medmar Inc.. (Holder, Valerie)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Setting a Settlement Conference for 2/4/2019 at 9:30AM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. Counsel for each side are to submit a confidential letter via e-mail to Judge Papak (using the e-mail address: "PKpropdoc@ord.uscourts.gov") not later than noon on 1/31/2019 which includes: 1) a brief outline (not argument) of the issues involved in the case; 2) your current position regarding settlement; 3) the last settlement offer made by each party; and 4) any settlement proposal you would agree to make to conclude the matter at this time. Counsel should bring their clients to the conference (or otherwise have them be available by telephone as expressed in prior e-mails to counsel) and should also bring or have available for immediate conference anyone who retains final settlement authority. (gm)
January 30, 2019 Filing 78 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Oral Argument held on 1/23/2019 before Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman, Court Reporter Bonita J. Shumway, telephone number 503-326-8188 or bonita_shumway@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 2/6/2019. Redaction Request due 2/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2019. (Shumway, Bonita)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: All parties present at the 01/23/19 hearing for Case No. 3:18-cv-02076-MO, and any parties named in Case No. 3:19-cv-00083-MO are ordered to submit mediation briefs to Judge Papak by the time frame indicated in his forthcoming settlement conference scheduling order and be prepared to attend mediation on the designated date should Judge Papak require their presence. Overseas clients may appear telephonically as long as they are readily available to be contacted as needed during the conference. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
January 29, 2019 Filing 76 Supplemental Memorandum in Support Regarding Standard of Proof to Sustain Attachment. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Muranovic, Sanja)
January 25, 2019 Filing 75 Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule by Plaintiff Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sparkman, Briton)
January 25, 2019 Filing 74 Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule Vigorous Shipping's Proposed Case Management Schedule. Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Muranovic, Sanja)
January 23, 2019 Filing 73 MINUTES of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held. As stated on the record, Defendant's Vigorous Shipping's Motion to Vacate #15 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Authorization to Issue Subpoena #64 is GRANTED. Parties are to confer regarding a hearing schedule and inform the Court if they can agree on a schedule. If not, parties are instructed to file individual proposed schedules with the Court by 5pm Pacific Standard Time on 01/25/19. Briton P. Sparkman, and Kent Roberts present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Jess G. Webster, Keith B. Letourneau and Garrett Garfield present as counsel for defendant(s).(Court Reporter Bonita Shumway.)Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (dls)
January 23, 2019 Filing 72 Notice Letter to Judge Mosman Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Muranovic, Sanja)
January 23, 2019 Filing 71 Notice of Appearance of C. Kent Roberts Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Boyajian, David)
January 23, 2019 Filing 70 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on 1/23/2019 before Judge Mosman. Court Reporter: Bonita. . Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Boyajian, David)
January 23, 2019 Filing 69 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on 1/23/19 before Judge Mosman. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. . Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Webster, Jess)
January 18, 2019 Filing 68 First Amended Complaint . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Verification). (Sparkman, Briton) Restricted Entry to Case Participants at Filer's Request on 1/18/2019 (joha).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman regarding Motion to Vacate Maritime Rule B Attachment Order on motion for issuance #6 #15 . Oral Argument is set for 1/23/2019 at 09:00AM in Portland Courtroom 16 before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition #60 . Amended Complaint is due 1/18/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
January 17, 2019 Filing 65 Reply to Motion to Vacate Maritime Rule B Attachment Order on motion for issuance #6 #15 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21) (Muranovic, Sanja)
January 17, 2019 Filing 64 Motion Requesting Authorization to Issue Subpoena to the American Steamship Owners Mutual Protection and Indemnity Association, Inc.. Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Boyajian, David)
January 16, 2019 Filing 63 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #62 Declaration #60 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition. The PDF attached to this entry at filing was incorrect. The document was illegible (exhibits 1-10). A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
January 15, 2019 Filing 62 Second Declaration of Briton P. Sparkman in Opposition to Motion to Vacate. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #61 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 10, #2 Exhibit 11 - 20, #3 Exhibit 21 - 24) (Sparkman, Briton) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/16/2019) (cw).
January 15, 2019 Filing 61 Supplemental Response in Opposition to Motion to Vacate Maritime Rule B Attachment Order on motion for issuance #6 #15 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Sparkman, Briton)
January 15, 2019 Filing 60 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit List for First Amended Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibits 1-10 to First Amended Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibits 11-20 to First Amended Verified Complaint, #5 Exhibits 21-25 to First Amended Verified Complaint, #6 Verification) (Sparkman, Briton) (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/16/2019) (cw).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: Plaintiff should file a Supplemental Response to Defendant Vigorouss Motion to Vacate #15 , due by 01/15/19. If Plaintiff wishes, it may include in its briefing any specific items it lacks to sufficiently brief on the merits. These specific items must be ones Plaintiff could obtain through emergency discovery. Defendant Vigorouss optional reply is due by 12:00 PM Pacific Standard Time on 01/17/2019. The Court will hold a hearing if it deems it necessary. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
January 3, 2019 Filing 58 Response Notice to Court re Production of Discovery and Renewed Request to Vacate Attachment to Motion to Vacate Maritime Rule B Attachment Order on motion for issuance #6 #15 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 28, 2018 Filing 57 Memorandum in Opposition Vigorous Shipping & Trading's Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Update and Memorandum in Support of Supplemental Discovery. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Part 1, #3 Exhibit B - Part 2A, #4 Exhibit B - Part 2B, #5 Exhibit B - Part 3A, #6 Exhibit B - Part 3B, #7 Exhibit B - Part 3C, #8 Exhibit B - Part 3D, #9 Exhibit B - Part 3E, #10 Exhibit B - Part 3F, #11 Exhibit B - Part 3G, #12 Exhibit B - Part 3H, #13 Exhibit B - Part 4A, #14 Exhibit B - Part 4B, #15 Exhibit B - Part 4C, #16 Exhibit B - Part 5A, #17 Exhibit B - Part 5B, #18 Exhibit B - Part 5C, #19 Exhibit B - Part 5D, #20 Exhibit B - Part 6A, #21 Exhibit B - Part 6B, #22 Exhibit B - Part 7A, #23 Exhibit B - Part 7B, #24 Exhibit C, #25 Exhibit D, #26 Exhibit E, #27 Exhibit F, #28 Exhibit G) (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 28, 2018 Filing 56 Notice of Intent to Raise Issues of Foreign Law Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 27, 2018 Filing 55 Memorandum in Support of Supplemental Discovery and Discovery Update. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Boyajian, David)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Depositions #42 is DENIED. Defendant's Motion for Bond #43 is DENIED. Defendants may move for reconsideration of bond following the Court's ruling on any potential supplementary discovery requests. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
December 18, 2018 Filing 53 Supplemental Response Second Supplemental Response to Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Depositions #42 . Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 18, 2018 Filing 52 Reply in Response to Opposition (DE 49, 50) and in further Support to Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Depositions #42 . Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Sparkman, Briton)
December 18, 2018 Filing 51 Supplemental Response to Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Depositions #42 . Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 18, 2018 Filing 50 Declaration of Jeremy A. Herschaft . Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #49 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 18, 2018 Filing 49 Response in Opposition to Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Depositions #42 . Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 18, 2018 Filing 48 Declaration of Briton P. Sparkman in Support of Emergency Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #42 .) (Sparkman, Briton)
December 17, 2018 Filing 47 Second Declaration of Michael John Fitzgerald . Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Related document(s): Memorandum #45 .) (Sparkman, Briton)
December 17, 2018 Filing 46 Declaration of Edward Mills-Webb . Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Related document(s): Memorandum #45 .) (Sparkman, Briton)
December 17, 2018 Filing 45 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Vigorous Shipping Ltd's Request for Bond. Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Sparkman, Briton)
December 17, 2018 Filing 44 Declaration of Efstahios Gourdomichalis . Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Related document(s): Motion for Bond #43 .) (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 17, 2018 Filing 43 Motion for Bond Memorandum Regarding Requirement of Bond Pending Jurisdictional Discovery. Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 17, 2018 Filing 42 Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Depositions. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sparkman, Briton)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: GRANTING Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Protective Order #39 . As the protective order has been signed, Defendant is ordered to produce the documents referenced in its Exhibit 2 [38-2] and Plaintiff is ordered to hold the depositions of George and Stathis Gourdomichalis as discussed in Defendant's Response to Discovery #38 on or before 12/22/18. Following Defendant's production and Plaintiff's depositions, Plaintiff may submit a supplemental request for expedited discovery by 12/27/18 if necessary and the Court will rule immediately. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed on 12/17/18 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
December 17, 2018 Filing 39 Unopposed Motion for Protective Order . Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 14, 2018 Filing 38 Notice re Notice #37 Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Plan Proposal Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Related document(s): Notice #37 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 13, 2018 Filing 37 Notice of Plaintiff's Discovery Plan Proposal Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Sparkman, Briton)
December 13, 2018 Filing 35 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Oral Argument held on 12/12/2018 before Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman, Court Reporter Bonita J. Shumway, telephone number 503-326-8188 or bonita_shumway@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 12/20/2018. Redaction Request due 1/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2019. (Shumway, Bonita)
December 12, 2018 Filing 36 MINUTES of Proceedings: Oral argument held. Defendant's Motion to Vacate #15 will be taken under advisement pending further briefing. Briton Sparkman, David Boyajian present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Jeremy Herschaft, Sanja Muranovic, Garrett Garfield present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (kms)
December 12, 2018 Filing 34 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on 12/12/18 before Judge Mosman. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Tape Number: unknown. . Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 12, 2018 Filing 33 Declaration of Garret S. Garfield . Filed by Al-Saeed Trading Company, Y.S.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Garfield, Garrett)
December 12, 2018 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Al-Saeed Trading Company, Y.S.C.. (Garfield, Garrett)
December 12, 2018 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance of Garrett S. Garfield appearing on behalf of Al-Saeed Trading Company, Y.S.C. Limited Notice of Appearance Filed by on behalf of Al-Saeed Trading Company, Y.S.C.. (Garfield, Garrett)
December 11, 2018 Filing 30 Declaration of Briton P. Sparkman . Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #28 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Sparkman, Briton)
December 11, 2018 Filing 29 Declaration of Michael John Fitzgerald . Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #28 .) (Sparkman, Briton)
December 11, 2018 Filing 28 Response in Opposition to Motion to Vacate Maritime Rule B Attachment Order on motion for issuance #6 #15 . Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Sparkman, Briton)
December 11, 2018 Filing 27 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Briton P. Sparkman (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: bpsparkman. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Briton P. Sparkman for Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5662293 issued. Signed on 12/11/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Response is due by 12/11/2018. Oral Argument is set for 12/12/2018 at 09:00AM in Portland Courtroom 16 before Judge Michael W. Mosman, regarding Motion to Vacate Maritime Rule B Attachment Order on motion for issuance #6 #15 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
December 10, 2018 Filing 24 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Keith B. Letourneau (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: kbletourneau. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Keith B. Letourneau for Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5661647 issued. Signed on 12/10/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
December 10, 2018 Filing 22 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jeremy A. Herschaft (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jaherschaft. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy A. Herschaft for Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5661640 issued. Signed on 12/10/2018 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
December 10, 2018 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance of Jess G. Webster appearing on behalf of Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A. Filed by on behalf of Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Webster, Jess)
December 10, 2018 Filing 19 Declaration of Sanja Muranovic . Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Related document(s): Motion to Vacate, #15 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 10, 2018 Filing 18 Declaration of Patrick Holloway . Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Related document(s): Motion to Vacate, #15 .) (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 10, 2018 Filing 17 Declaration of George Gourdomichalis . Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Related document(s): Motion to Vacate, #15 .) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Registered list of Blue WAll owner) (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 10, 2018 Filing 16 Declaration of Stathis Gourdomichalis . Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Related document(s): Motion to Vacate, #15 .) (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 Motion to Vacate Maritime Rule B Attachment Order on motion for issuance #6 . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Muranovic, Sanja)
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Briton P. Sparkman . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5662293. Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Boyajian, David)
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Keith B. Letourneau . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5661647. Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Helmer, M.)
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeremy A. Herschaft . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5661640. Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Helmer, M.)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 Notice re Complaint,, #1 Notice of Restricted Appearance Pursuant to Rule E(8) Filed by Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. (Related document(s): Complaint,, #1 .) (Helmer, M.)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Oral Argument is set for 12/12/2018 at 09:00AM-10:00AM in Portland Courtroom 16 before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Defendant Vigorous Shipping & Trading, S.A. notified the Court that it will be filing a Motion to Vacate. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ALLOWING CARGO HANDLING, REPAIRS AND MOVEMENT OF VESSEL. Signed on 12/3/2018 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPOINTING CASCADE MARINE AGENCIES LTD. AS SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN. Signed on 12/3/2018 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF PROCESS OF MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT #2 . Signed on 12/3/2018 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to Appoint Custodian . Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boyajian, David)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for Order Allowing Cargo Handling, Repairs and Movement of Vessel. Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boyajian, David)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Boyajian, David)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Motion for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document, #2 Proposed Order) (Boyajian, David)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 Verified Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5654065 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Pacific Gulf Shipping Co. against Adamastos Shipping & Trading S.A., Blue Wall Shipping Ltd., Phoenix Shipping & Trading S.A., Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Verification of Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Proposed Summons, #16 Civil Cover Sheet). (Boyajian, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Gulf Shipping Co. v. Adamastos Shipping & Trading S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Shipping & Trading S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Wall Shipping Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.
Represented By: Jess G. Webster
Represented By: Keith B. Letourneau
Represented By: M. Christie Helmer
Represented By: Sanja Muranovic
Represented By: Jeremy A. Herschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adamastos Shipping & Trading S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Efstathios Gourdomichalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thalassa Holdings S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alastor Marine S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Gourdomichalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Gulf Shipping Co.
Represented By: David R. Boyajian
Represented By: Briton P. Sparkman
Represented By: C. Kent Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Al-Saeed Trading Company, Y.S.C.
Represented By: Garrett S. Garfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Medmar Inc.
Represented By: Valerie I. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?