Whalen v. Columbia County et al

Plaintiff: Susan Whalen
Defendant: Columbia County, Julie Weigand, Vivek Shah, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Terry Kallio and Sheriff Jeff Dickerson
Case Number: 3:2018cv02090
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 21 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by Susan Whalen. (Merrithew, Jesse)
January 31, 2019 Filing 20 Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by Susan Whalen. (Merrithew, Jesse)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting Defendants Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Vivek Shah, MD, and Julie Weigand's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Appear (ECF No. #16 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 3/12/2019. Ordered on 1/29/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
January 29, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Correct Care Solutions, LLC. (Houser, Jacqueline)
January 29, 2019 Filing 17 Declaration of Jacqueline E. Houser In Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Vivek Shah, Julie Weigand. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #16 .) (Houser, Jacqueline)
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise appear. Filed by Julie Weigand, Vivek Shah, Correct Care Solutions, LLC. (Houser, Jacqueline)
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Terry Kallio waiver sent on 1/11/2019. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Merrithew, Jesse)
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service upon Julie Weigand served on 12/31/2018 Filed by Susan Whalen. (Merrithew, Jesse)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service upon Vivek Shah served on 12/22/2018 Filed by Susan Whalen. (Merrithew, Jesse)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service upon Correct Care Solutions, LLC served on 12/14/2018 Filed by Susan Whalen. (Merrithew, Jesse)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Jeff Dickerson waiver sent on 12/12/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Merrithew, Jesse)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Columbia County waiver sent on 12/12/2018. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Merrithew, Jesse)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 issued summons, #2 issued summons, #3 issued summons, #4 issued summons, #5 issued summons) (ecp)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 Proposed Summons to Vivik Shah Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Merrithew, Jesse)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Summons to Terry Kallio Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Merrithew, Jesse)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons to Julie Wiegand Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Merrithew, Jesse)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to Jeff Dickerson Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Merrithew, Jesse)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Correct Care Solutions Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Merrithew, Jesse)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Columbia County Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Merrithew, Jesse)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/5/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/6/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/6/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5658606 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Susan Whalen against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Merrithew, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whalen v. Columbia County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Weigand
Represented By: Jacqueline Houser
Represented By: Eric J. Neiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivek Shah
Represented By: Jacqueline Houser
Represented By: Eric J. Neiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Houser
Represented By: Eric J. Neiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Kallio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Jeff Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Whalen
Represented By: Jesse A. Merrithew
Represented By: Ethan Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?