Klein v. Electro Scientific Industries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Melvyn Klein
Defendant: Frederick A. Ball, Raymond A. Link, Richard H. Wills, Laurence E. Cramer, Electro Scientific Industries, Inc., Lynne J. Camp and Michael D. Burger
Case Number: 3:2018cv02099
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Scheduling Order: (1) All deadlines in this action are stayed pending settlement discussions and/or consolidation of all Related Actions, the appointment of a lead plaintiff, and either the filing of an amended complaint in the consolidated action or the designation of an operative complaint for the consolidated action by the lead plaintiff; (2) Defendants are not required to respond to the Complaint, pending further order of the Court; and (3) if necessary, after an amended complaint is filed in, or an operative complaint is designated for, the consolidated action by the lead plaintiff, the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order setting forth the dates for filing any motion to dismiss and associated briefing. The parties shall submit a joint status report to the court by March 29, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 30, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and to Stay Other Pending Court Deadlines Complaint, #1 , Amended Complaint #4 . Filed by All Defendants. (Angeli, David)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Thomas J. McKenna (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: tjmckenna. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas J. McKenna for Melvyn Klein. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5666654 issued. Signed on 12/17/2018 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katherine L. Henderson for Frederick A. Ball, Michael D. Burger, Lynne J. Camp, Laurence E. Cramer, Electro Scientific Industries, Inc., Raymond A. Link, and Richard H. Wills. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5664503 issued. Signed on 12/17/2018 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
December 17, 2018 Filing 13 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Boris Feldman (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: bfeldman. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Boris Feldman for Frederick A. Ball, Michael D. Burger, Lynne J. Camp, Laurence E. Cramer, Electro Scientific Industries, Inc., Raymond A. Link, and Richard H. Wills. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5664492 issued. Signed on 12/17/2018 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas J. McKenna . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5666654. Filed by Melvyn Klein. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance Filed by All Defendants. (Shechter, Neal)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by Melvyn Klein. (Dahab, Nadia)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Electro Scientific Industries, Inc.. (Angeli, David)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine Henderson . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5664503. Filed by All Defendants. (Angeli, David)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Boris Feldman . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5664492. Filed by All Defendants. (Angeli, David)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of David H. Angeli appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Angeli, David)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Melvyn Klein against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certification of Named Plaintiff). (Dahab, Nadia)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/8/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/6/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (sss)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Class Action Allegation Complaint Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5660438 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Melvyn Klein against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certification of Named Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons). (Dahab, Nadia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein v. Electro Scientific Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick A. Ball
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Neal S. Shechter
Represented By: Katherine L. Henderson
Represented By: David H. Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond A. Link
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Neal S. Shechter
Represented By: Katherine L. Henderson
Represented By: David H. Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H. Wills
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Neal S. Shechter
Represented By: Katherine L. Henderson
Represented By: David H. Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence E. Cramer
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Neal S. Shechter
Represented By: Katherine L. Henderson
Represented By: David H. Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electro Scientific Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Neal S. Shechter
Represented By: Katherine L. Henderson
Represented By: David H. Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne J. Camp
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Neal S. Shechter
Represented By: Katherine L. Henderson
Represented By: David H. Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Burger
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Neal S. Shechter
Represented By: Katherine L. Henderson
Represented By: David H. Angeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvyn Klein
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Thomas J. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?