Johnson et al v. Marriott International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chris Harris and David Johnson
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02119
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: GRANTING Unopposed Stipulated Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision by JPML (#8 ). Signed on January 4, 2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (eo)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Stay Proceedings Pending Decision by JPML. Filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hineline, Curt)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 Demand for Jury Trial by Marriott International, Inc. . Filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Hineline, Curt)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Daniel R. Warren (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: drwarren. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel R. Warren for Marriott International, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5674373 issued. Signed on 12/19/2018 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ecp) Modified on 12/20/2018 to correct file and signature date (ecp).
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel R. Warren . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5674373. Filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Hineline, Curt)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 4/10/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/10/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/10/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sss)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Marriott International, Inc.. (Hineline, Curt)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18-cv-54883 from Circuit Court of Multnomah. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5663440 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Marriott International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A thru D to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Hineline, Curt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Harris
Represented By: Michael R. Fuller
Represented By: Kelly D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Fuller
Represented By: Kelly D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?