Drese v. Sephora USA INC

Plaintiff: Jessica Drese
Defendant: Sephora USA INC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02131
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for 3/11/2019 at 2:30PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint, and Defenses Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Sephora USA INC. (Barrett, James)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Sephora USA INC. (Barrett, James)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #5 as follows: Answer deadline reset to 1/25/2019 for Defendant Sephora USA Inc. (gm)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Sephora USA INC. (Barrett, James)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #3 upon Sephora USA INC served on 12/14/2018 Filed by Jessica Drese. (Crispin, Craig)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Sephora USA INC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/12/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/13/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/13/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ecp)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5666724 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Jessica Drese against Sephora USA INC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Sephora USA INC). (Crispin, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drese v. Sephora USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sephora USA INC
Represented By: James M. Barrett
Represented By: Christopher A. Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Drese
Represented By: Craig A. Crispin
Represented By: Ashley A. Marton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?