Camarata v. Apple Computer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gene Camarata
Defendant: PORTLAND POLICE OFFICERS JOHN DOES 1-5, Apple Pioneer Place, City of Portland, JOHN DOES INDIVIDUALS 1-5, Apple Computer, Inc. and JOHN DOE CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2018cv02134
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan "Defendants' Joint Status Report". Filed by City of Portland. (Bailey, Ryan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Notice of Case Assignment #3 sent to Gene Camarata returned as undeliverable. (joha)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by City of Portland. (Bailey, Ryan)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Lee, Rachel)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Service by Apple Computer, Inc. of Discovery order, #3 Filed by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Lee, Rachel)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 4/12/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/13/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/13/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (joha) (Copy Mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff.)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Lee, Rachel)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV41552 from Oregon Circuit Court, Multnomah County. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5666943 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Apple Computer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lee, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camarata v. Apple Computer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTLAND POLICE OFFICERS JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Pioneer Place
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Portland
Represented By: Ryan C. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES INDIVIDUALS 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Computer, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel C. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Camarata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?