Miles v. TLC Resorts LLC
Plaintiff: Colleen Miles
Defendant: TLC Resorts LLC and TLC Resorts Vacation Club LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02160
Filed: December 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Referring Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to All Defendants. (Fuller, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to TLC Resorts Vacation Club LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
January 12, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Complaint . Filed by Colleen Miles against TLC Resorts Vacation Club LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons). (Fuller, Michael)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to TLC Resorts LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/16/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/16/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/16/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
December 16, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5670922 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Colleen Miles against TLC Resorts LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Fuller, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. TLC Resorts LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLC Resorts LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLC Resorts Vacation Club LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Miles
Represented By: Michael R. Fuller
Represented By: Kelly D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?