Dermansky v. Index Newspapers LLC

Plaintiff: Julie Dermansky
Defendant: Index Newspapers LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02161
Filed: December 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of David M. Heineck appearing on behalf of Index Newspapers LLC Filed by on behalf of Index Newspapers LLC. (Heineck, David)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Register of Copyrigths regarding Copyright Report, #4 . (ecp)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (ecp)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Index Newspapers LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/16/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/16/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/16/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ecp)
December 16, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5670929 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VA 2-062-374--2 animals--Julie Dermansky, VA 2-062-374--Animal with Yellow Eyes--Julie Dermansky. Filed by Julie Dermansky against Index Newspapers LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #6 Attachment Notification of filing and determination of actions). (Stevens, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dermansky v. Index Newspapers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Dermansky
Represented By: Michael O. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Index Newspapers LLC
Represented By: David M. Heineck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?