Hernandez v. Myers
Petitioner: Aracely Hernandez
Respondent: Paula Myers
Case Number: 3:2019cv00029
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Aracely Hernandez regarding Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings, 11 . (dsg)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order regarding Respondent's Motion to Dismiss #10 .. Petitioner's Response is due by 3/15/2019. Respondent's Reply is due by 3/29/2019. Motion is taken under advisement as of 3/29/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ps1)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to Dismiss . Filed by Paula Myers. (Boyd, Kristen)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristen E. Boyd is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Paula Myers. (Boyd, Kristen)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Paula Myers. Filed by Paula Myers. (Larsen, Lynn)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #1 on respondent. Answer is due by 3/19/2019. Signed on 1/16/19 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment, #2 Petition) (Mailed order to petitioner) (dsg)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg)
January 11, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 81785 issued. (tj)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time #2 . Petitioner has until 2/7/2019, to either submit the $5.00 filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis. See 28 U.S.C. Secs. 1914, 1915. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ps1)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Anna J. Brown. (Mailed copy to petitioner) (dsg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Aracely Hernandez. (dsg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Aracely Hernandez against Paula Myers. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aracely Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paula Myers
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Kristen E. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?