Ballard v. Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC

Plaintiff: Nathaniel C. Ballard
Defendant: Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00042
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: As plaintiff has not filed a status report as directed by this court, the motion for appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice and with leave to renew #3 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Copy of this order mailed to plaintiff) (pvh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Nathaniel C. Ballard regarding Notice to Self-Represented Litigants #7 . (pvh)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice to Self-Represented Litigants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Nathaniel C. Ballard regarding Order 5 . (pvh)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court holds plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #3 in ABEYANCE and DIRECTS plaintiff to provide a status report by 2/15/2019 including all of the efforts he has made to retain counsel in this case. There is no right to counsel in a civil case, and the number of lawyers who volunteer to take civil cases at no charge is limited. Therefore, this court will consider a motion to appoint counsel only if plaintiff has made a good-faith effort to otherwise retain counsel. A good faith effort includes contacting several attorneys and not just those who are the most high-profile or have the most name recognition. Even with such a showing, there is no guarantee that the court will be able to secure volunteer counsel, as the court can merely ask an attorney to voluntarily take a civil case without pay and cannot require an attorney to do so. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (joha) (Copy Mailed to Plaintiff.)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Nathaniel C. Ballard. (joha)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Nathaniel C. Ballard against Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (joha)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Nathaniel C. Ballard. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballard v. Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Budget Car Rental, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel C. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?